Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Stopa, Mark, filed a(n) Other Civil - Circuit case against Dibert, Stephen J, Mfi Miami Holdings Llc, represented by Samantha Stevins, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil - Circuit |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
This complaint, filed in the Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida, involves a dispute between the plaintiff, Mark P. Stopa, and the defendants, MFI-Miami Holdings, LLC and Stephen J. Dibert. The plaintiff alleges th...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 4 ISSUED Party: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: December 31, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 41 03032022 11:00 VIA TELEPHONE
Date: February 04, 2022PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL Doc # 40
Date: February 03, 2022MOTION Doc # 33 FOR ATTORNEY S FEES W/EXHIBITS Filed by: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: January 24, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 31
Date: November 24, 2021CORRESPONDENCE Doc # 29 DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SEEK LEGAL REPRESENTATION
Date: January 15, 2021REQUEST FOR Doc # 30 (DEFT) ADDITIONAL TIME TO SEEK LEGAL REPRESENTATION
Date: January 15, 2021ORDER GRANTING Doc # 27 MOTN TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFT MFI-MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: November 17, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 25 TELEPHONIC 11162020 9:30
Date: November 03, 2020CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 26 PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 16, 2020DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 24 AS COUNSEL
Date: November 02, 2020DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE Doc # 39 SHAM PLEADING W/EXHIBIT
Date: February 02, 2022COPY Doc # 28 COMPLAINT FILIND IN BANKRUPTCY COURT W/ATTACHMENTS
Date: November 30, 2020REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Doc # 37 W/ MEMORANDUM OF LAW W/ ATTACHMENTS
Date: January 24, 2022COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: DIBERT, STEPHEN J
Date: December 31, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 5 OF STEPHEN J DIBERT
Date: March 02, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 9 ENTERED
Date: March 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 7 01312020 Party: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: March 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 8 01312020 Party: DIBERT, STEPHEN J
Date: March 05, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 10 Party: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: March 06, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 13 AFTER DEFAULT
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING Doc # 12 PARTY Party: DIBERT, STEPHEN J
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 14 Party: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: March 10, 2020ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 16 Party: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Date: March 10, 2020DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 15
Date: March 10, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 19 W/ATTACHMENT
Date: March 12, 2020REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 18
Date: March 12, 2020DEF-RESP'S MOTION Doc # 17 VACATE DEFAULT
Date: March 11, 2020ORDER - NOT SIGNED BY COURT Doc # 20 ON FINAL INJUNCTION
Date: March 17, 2020NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 22
Date: April 10, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 21
Date: April 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 42 EMAIL FROM ABUSIVE PLAINTIFF
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 41 03032022 11:00 VIA TELEPHONE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL Doc # 40
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 38 (DEFTS) OF ADOPTING PREVIOUSLY-FILED COURT DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR COURT-ASSISTED TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO STRIKE Doc # 39 SHAM PLEADING W/EXHIBIT
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION Doc # 34 SEEKING TO DECLARE PRO SE LITIGANT MARK STOPA A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT/REQUEST FOR BOND/MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND REQUEST FOR ATTYS FEES Filed by: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 32 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL Party: DIBERT, STEPHEN J Party: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION Doc # 33 FOR ATTORNEY S FEES W/EXHIBITS Filed by: MFI MIAMI HOLDINGS LLC
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Doc # 37 W/ MEMORANDUM OF LAW W/ ATTACHMENTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Doc # 36 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.