Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synergy Contracting Group Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Steven Battisti, Esq, Steven I Battisti, against Safepoint Insurance Company, represented by Andrew L Bickford, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Synergy Contracting Group, Inc. on behalf of Teresa Gunter against Safepoint Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract of an insurance policy between Teresa Gunter and Safepoint, seeking damages of more th...
EXHIBIT Doc # 6 ESTIMATE OF REPAIRS
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 13 /NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: January 21, 2019COMPLAINT Doc # 3
Date: December 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 7 ESTIMATE OF REPAIRS
Date: December 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION
Date: December 31, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 10
Date: December 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 8 ESTIMATE OF REPAIRS
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 9
Date: December 31, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: December 31, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 11
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 4 ASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS
Date: December 31, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 12
Date: January 03, 2019NOTICE Doc # 14 OF SETTLEMENT
Date: February 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 16 W/ PREJUDICE BY Party: SYNERGY CONTRACTING GROUP INC
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 15
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 14 OF SETTLEMENT
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 13 /NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 12
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 6 ESTIMATE OF REPAIRS
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Doc # 3
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 7 ESTIMATE OF REPAIRS
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 10
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.