Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Mateusz Marcin Szymanski, against Kovacs, Megan C, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Megan C Kovacs. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant breached their duty to make periodic payments on a credit account owned by the plaintiff, resulting in the account being charged off. Th...
EXHIBIT Doc # 7 3 - ASSISTANT SECRETARYS CERTIFICATE
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 5 1 - ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Date: December 28, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 4
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 6 2 - MILITARY STATUS REPORT
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 2
Date: December 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: KOVACS, MEGAN C
Date: December 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 8 MEGAN KOVACS / 18-BK-00011
Date: January 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 10 KOVACS, MEGAN C Vol./Book 20477, Page 1219, 2 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 10KOVACS, MEGAN CVol./Book 20477, Page 1219, 2 pages | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11 | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer DAY, JACK)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer DAY, JACK) | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 9
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 9 | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 8 MEGAN KOVACS / 18-BK-00011
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 8MEGAN KOVACS / 18-BK-00011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.