Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Amir Naderpour, against Freeman, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Mark A Freeman in the County Court of the 6th Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages and/or an action to collect a debt. The court has jurisdiction over the ...
EXHIBIT COMPOSITE A - CREDIT CARD APPLICATION
Date: February 28, 2017EXHIBIT COMPOSITE C - BALANCE SUMMARY
Date: February 28, 2017EXHIBIT COMPOSITE B - CREDIT CARD AGREEMENT
Date: February 28, 2017ATTACHMENT ALIAS SUMMONS
Date: June 20, 2017ATTACHMENT SUMMONS
Date: March 15, 2017REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED Party: FREEMAN, MARK A
Date: May 31, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: FREEMAN, MARK A
Date: February 28, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Party: FREEMAN, MARK A
Date: March 15, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: February 28, 2017ANSWER OF Party: FREEMAN, MARK A
Date: June 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS 061617 Party: FREEMAN, MARK A
Date: June 20, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: February 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES Doc # 4
Date: November 14, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 11 021919 11:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: January 29, 2019ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 15
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 8 OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTOBNEYS' FEES
Date: January 19, 2018NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 1
Date: November 14, 2017NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 6 ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2018MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 2 Party: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Date: November 14, 2017NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 10 UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT MARK A FREEMAN
Date: January 10, 2019COURT WORKSHEET Doc # 13
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 3
Date: November 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Doc # 5 W/ATTACHED BANK DOCUMENTS
Date: November 14, 2017SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 12
Date: January 30, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 7 AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: January 19, 2018PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Doc # 19
Date: June 11, 2020ORDER GRANTING Doc # 14 PLTFS SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: February 20, 2019FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 17 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 20445, Page 1063, 1 pages
Date: February 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT LIEN (R) Doc # 18 Vol./Book 21038, Page 648, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR RECORDATION OF JDMT AS LIEN Doc # 19
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 17 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 20445, Page 1063, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS) Doc # 16
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 15
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 14 PLTFS SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
COURT WORKSHEET Doc # 13
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 12
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.