Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cf Emerald Pointe Gardens Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Michael George F Davis, against Quiles, Angel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a residential eviction case filed by CF Emerald Pointe Gardens LLC, also known as Emerald Pointe Apartments, against the defendant, Angel Quiles. The plaintiff is seeking to evict the defendant from the property located at 175 73rd ...
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 1
Date: September 18, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: QUILES, ANGEL
Date: March 02, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: February 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: February 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: QUILES, ANGEL
Date: February 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2017STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Date: March 17, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Date: March 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 1
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT / DISMISSAL OF CASE W/O PREJUDICE Vol./Book 19564, Page 2392, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: QUILES, ANGEL
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: QUILES, ANGEL
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.