Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ced Capital Holdings Xiv L Llc As General Partner Of Riverside Partners Ltd, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Michael George F Davis, against Coleman, Qwenobia, Mejia-Garcia, Katrinia, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
ANSWER OF Party: COLEMAN, QWENOBIA Party: MEJIA-GARCIA, KATRINIA
Date: March 10, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: MEJIA-GARCIA, KATRINIA
Date: March 02, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: COLEMAN, QWENOBIA
Date: March 02, 2017CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT --- DENIED
Date: April 05, 2017MOTION TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT
Date: March 14, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: February 28, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Date: April 07, 2017ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY
Date: March 24, 2017VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 14, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 022817 Party: MEJIA-GARCIA, KATRINIA
Date: February 28, 2017ORDER DENYING DEFTS MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: April 05, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19566, Page 1925, 1 pages
Date: March 24, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED ON 022817 Party: COLEMAN, QWENOBIA
Date: February 28, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 24, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Date: March 28, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: COLEMAN, QWENOBIA Party: MEJIA-GARCIA, KATRINIA
Date: March 24, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: February 28, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT
Date: March 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT --- DENIED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING DEFTS MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION STAY WRIT/ DENIED BY COURT Party: COLEMAN, QWENOBIA Party: MEJIA-GARCIA, KATRINIA
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19566, Page 1925, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: COLEMAN, QWENOBIA Party: MEJIA-GARCIA, KATRINIA
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.