Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mhc Hillcrest Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Stanley L Martin, Esq, against Russell, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal case filed by MHC Hillcrest, L.L.C. against Charles Russell in the County Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking possession of a mobile home lot and money damages not exceed...
EXHIBIT A DEMAND FOR PAYMENT
Date: January 26, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: RUSSELL, CHARLES
Date: February 15, 2016DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: RUSSELL, CHARLES
Date: March 01, 2016SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 021316 Party: RUSSELL, CHARLES
Date: February 17, 2016WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 031816
Date: March 18, 2016AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2016SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: RUSSELL, CHARLES
Date: February 11, 2016CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED DEFAULT FINAL JDMT
Date: March 08, 2016FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19111, Page 1338, 1 pages
Date: March 08, 2016CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: January 26, 2016WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: March 28, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION
Date: March 02, 2016RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I
Date: March 21, 2016MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 03/01/2016 Party: MHC HILLCREST LLC
Date: February 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 031816
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED DEFAULT FINAL JDMT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19111, Page 1338, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED COUNT I Party: RUSSELL, CHARLES
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT DEFAULT ENTERED 03/01/2016 Party: MHC HILLCREST LLC
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.