Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Feiga Clairmont Lp An New York Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Daniel G Drake, against Blaylock, Heather R, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal document filed by FEIGA/CLAIRMONT, L.P., d/b/a BUENA VISTA 1, against Heather R. Blaylock for eviction from a property located at 12100 Park Boulevard, Apt. 508, Seminole, Pinellas County, Florida. The defendant is in posses...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2014CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: BLAYLOCK, HEATHER R
Date: January 06, 2015DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: BLAYLOCK, HEATHER R
Date: January 28, 2015PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT AND ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: January 16, 2015EXHIBIT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 30, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: December 30, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2015(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Date: January 27, 2015NOTICE OF FILING VERIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2015EXHIBIT LEASE
Date: December 30, 2014SUMMONS - SERVED HEATHER R. BLAYLOCK 01/07/15
Date: January 16, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18663, Page 1293, 1 pages
Date: January 28, 2015EXHIBIT DEPT OF DEFENSE STATUS REPORT
Date: January 16, 2015ANSWER OF PRO SE Party: BLAYLOCK, HEATHER R
Date: January 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Party: BLAYLOCK, HEATHER R
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 18663, Page 1293, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT AND ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING VERIFICATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED HEATHER R. BLAYLOCK 01/07/15
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT DEPT OF DEFENSE STATUS REPORT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF PRO SE Party: BLAYLOCK, HEATHER R
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.