Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Byatt Dds, Clemens, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jeffrey A Eisel, Esq, against Mcrae , Paul, Md, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Date: February 10, 2014NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED DOCUMENT
Date: February 10, 2014NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE
Date: January 31, 2014EXHIBIT ACCOUNT
Date: January 31, 2014EXHIBIT CORRESPONDENCE
Date: January 31, 2014SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: MCRAE , PAUL, MD
Date: February 06, 2014CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST
Date: April 02, 2014SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Party: MCRAE , PAUL, MD
Date: February 06, 2014COMPLAINT E-FILED
Date: January 31, 2014EXHIBIT DEED OF REAL ESTATE
Date: January 31, 2014NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY
Date: February 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT $1988.38 PRIN $119.03 INT $199.22 COSTS Vol./Book 18393, Page 1466, 2 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT (SRS)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF AFFDS IN PROOF OF COST, INTEREST
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED DOCUMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT VIA ATTORNEY Party: MCRAE , PAUL, MD
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.