Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GRACE, RILEYJOHN WALTER
On July 04, 2021 a 3 case was filed against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge April J. Bristow presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 04, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 04, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Judge
Category
3
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Closed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
AGREED ORDER
Date: Aug 06, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: Aug 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: Jul 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Jul 07, 2021NOTICE INT PART IN DISCOVERY
Date: Jul 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: Jul 07, 2021CITATION/CASE CREATED
Date: Jul 07, 2021CITATION/CASE CREATED
Date: Jul 04, 2021CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 04, 2021ARREST RECORD
Date: Jul 04, 2021NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT
Date: Jul 04, 2021CITATION/CASE CREATED
Date: Jul 04, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NO ACTION TAKEN BY PROSECUTOR 843.02 OBSTRUCT WITHOUT VIOLENCE | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FILED 316.193(1) TCATS - DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled CD - CASE DISPOSITION on 8/11/2021 10:30:00 AM due to SEE AGREED ORDER | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR CD - CASE DISPOSITION 9/8/2021 10:30 AM Harper, Bradley CD - CASE DISPOSITION 9/8/2021 10:30 AM Harper, Bradley |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DRIVING RECORD REQUEST SUBMITTED TO DHSMV | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled CD - CASE DISPOSITION on 8/2/2021 10:30:00 AM due to SET PER COURT | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR CD - CASE DISPOSITION 8/11/2021 10:30 AM Harper, Bradley CD - CASE DISPOSITION 8/11/2021 10:30 AM Harper, Bradley |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, EMTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE INT PART IN DISCOVERY | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION/CASE CREATED AD6P99E 7/3/2021 FHP (TROOP L) 316.217(1A) $166.00 |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
316.217(1A) TCATS VEHICLE WITHOUT LIGHTS AT NIGHT 316.217(1A) |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT L: Cnty Crim - L (County) |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR CD - CASE DISPOSITION 8/2/2021 10:30 AM Harper, Bradley CD - CASE DISPOSITION 8/2/2021 10:30 AM Harper, Bradley |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOT GUILTY PLEA | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled AR - ARRAIGNMENT on 7/29/2021 1:00:00 PM due to NOAP, PLEA OF N/G | |
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION/CASE CREATED A770CWE 7/3/2021 FHP (TROOP L) 316.193(1) $0.00 |
|
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT | |
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST RECORD | |
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION/CASE CREATED AD6P98E 7/3/2021 FHP (TROOP L) 316.187(2A) $0.00 |
|
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET FOR AR - ARRAIGNMENT 7/29/2021 1:00 PM Damico, Paul AR - ARRAIGNMENT 7/29/2021 1:00 PM Damico, Paul |
|
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event | 843.02 OBSTRUCT WITHOUT VIOLENCE | |
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event | 316.193(1) TCATS - DUI ALCOHOL OR DRUGS 1ST OFF | |
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
316.187(2A) TCATS SPEED/70 INTERSTATE (REQUIRES SPEEDS) 316.187(2A) |
|
July 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT D: South Branch Division Calendar - D (County) |