Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Experimax Franchising Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christian Dorismond, Mark D Nichols, against Blutusk Tech Llc, Gina Fontana Siepierski, Jeffery Siepierski, represented by Justin G Prociv, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with James E. Nutt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Experimax Franchising, LLC against defendants Jeffery Siepierski, Gina Fontana-Siepierski, and Blutusk Tech, LLC. The plaintiff seeks monetary damages, injunctive relief, and attorney's fees and costs. The jurisdiction and ...
05/24/2021
Date: May 21, 202405/28/2021
Date: May 22, 202403/26/2021
Date: May 16, 202403/15/2021
Date: May 11, 202403/15/2021
Date: May 08, 202402/08/2021
Date: May 07, 202403/15/2021
Date: May 12, 202403/26/2021
Date: May 14, 202403/15/2021
Date: May 10, 202403/26/2021
Date: May 15, 202403/31/2021
Date: May 17, 202405/28/2021
Date: May 23, 202406/18/2021
Date: May 26, 202406/28/2021
Date: May 29, 202402/04/2021
Date: May 02, 202402/04/2021
Date: May 03, 202402/04/2021
Date: May 04, 202402/04/2021
Date: May 05, 202404/30/2021
Date: May 18, 202407/06/2021
Date: May 31, 202403/15/2021
Date: May 09, 202403/15/2021
Date: May 13, 202406/04/2021
Date: May 25, 202405/14/2021
Date: May 20, 202406/03/2021
Date: May 24, 202402/04/2021
Date: May 06, 202407/06/2021
Date: May 30, 202407/06/2021
Date: May 03, 203207/15/2021
Date: May 03, 203908/13/2021
Date: May 03, 204905/13/2021
Date: May 19, 202407/12/2021
Date: May 03, 203507/08/2021
Date: May 03, 203307/12/2021
Date: May 03, 203708/13/2021
Date: May 03, 204807/12/2021
Date: May 03, 203407/13/2021
Date: May 03, 203608/17/2021
Date: May 03, 205008/17/2021
Date: May 03, 205208/17/2021
Date: May 03, 205106/25/2021
Date: May 27, 202401/12/2022
Date: May 03, 206310/29/2021
Date: May 03, 205706/25/2021
Date: May 28, 202408/07/2021
Date: May 03, 204108/07/2021
Date: May 03, 204308/12/2021
Date: May 03, 204708/07/2021
Date: May 03, 204208/07/2021
Date: May 03, 204509/22/2021
Date: May 03, 205409/06/2021
Date: May 03, 205307/15/2021
Date: May 03, 204012/14/2021
Date: May 03, 206111/11/2021
Date: May 03, 205911/01/2021
Date: May 03, 205807/14/2021
Date: May 03, 203810/05/2021
Date: May 03, 205508/12/2021
Date: May 03, 204608/07/2021
Date: May 03, 204410/12/2021
Date: May 03, 205611/11/2021
Date: May 03, 206001/11/2022
Date: May 03, 2062CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 04, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 04, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 15, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: February 04, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: May 14, 2021ORDER GRANTING JNUTT DTD 3/31/21 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME -GRANTED
Date: March 31, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 26, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 04, 2021PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 3901026
Date: February 08, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 15, 2021MOTION MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: April 30, 2021MOTION FOR ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSES TO PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFTS)
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: March 26, 2021THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: May 13, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: November 11, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 12, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 24, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 25, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 12, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 12, 2021SUPPLEMENT
Date: November 11, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 04, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 03, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 11, 2022ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 11, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 09, 2022ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: February 25, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 09, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 07, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 07, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 18, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 28, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 09, 2022REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER EXTENDING TIME
Date: March 30, 2022ORDER ACCEPTING AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: August 13, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 14, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 07, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 07, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 17, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 17, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: August 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 15, 2021PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4082475
Date: June 28, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 22, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: July 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 12, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 06, 2021PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4100323
Date: July 12, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: November 01, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 07, 2021AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: August 13, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 17, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 07, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 06, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 08, 2021PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4100694
Date: July 13, 2021PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4103206
Date: July 14, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 12, 2021AGREED ORDER NUTT; ON OBJECTION TO NON PARTY SUBPOENA (SEE ORDER) DTD 3/9/2022
Date: March 09, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: March 29, 2022REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2063 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFF, EXPERIMAX FRANCHISING, LLC'S, AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
May 03, 2062 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFF, EXPERIMAX FRANCHISING, LLC'S, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
May 03, 2061 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENT | |
May 03, 2059 | Docket Event | REPLY/RESPONSE | |
May 03, 2058 | Docket Event | REPLY/RESPONSE | |
May 03, 2057 | Docket Event | ORDER JNUTT DTD 10/29/21 ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2021, JEFFERY SIEPIERSKI, GINA FONTANA-SIEPIERSKI, AND BLUTUSK TECH, LLC SHALL SUBMIT TO THE COURT A SUMMARY OF AND SUMMARY OF THEIR RESPONSES TO THE ISSUES RAISED IN EXPERIMAX FRANCHISING, LLC’S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, FILED JULY 15, 2021, AND MOTION TO DISMISS FILED JULY 15, 2021, EXPERIMAC FRANCHISING, LLC’S (“EXPERIMAC”) MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT AGAINST EXPERIMAC FRANCHISING, LLC AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, FILED AUGUST 12, 2021, UFG GROUP, INC. D/B/A UNITED FRANCHISE GROUP’S (“UFG”) MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT AGAINST UFG GROUP, INC. AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, FILED AUGUST 12, 2021, AND HEALTH CLUB EXPERTS.COM, LLC D/B/A BUSINESS FINANCE DEPOT’S (“HEALTH CLUB”) MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIMS FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES, FILED AUGUST 7 2021 ** SEE ORDER** | |
May 03, 2056 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
May 03, 2055 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 03, 2054 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.