Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Francis Aloyisius Mcmahon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joanne Marie Cook, Rachel Cichowic, against Bmw Of North America Llc, represented by Suzanne M Valles, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Samantha Schosberg Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Francis Aloyisius McMahon against BMW of North America, LLC. The plaintiff is a resident of Palm Beach County, Florida, and the defendant is a foreign limited liability company authorized to conduct business in Florida. The...
11/24/2021
Date: January 16, 2057PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3830559
Date: December 02, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 25, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: July 08, 2021PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3772093
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT
Date: July 08, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: October 06, 2021VERIFIED MOTION
Date: September 10, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 06, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 01, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 24, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: May 25, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 08, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: February 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 07, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: June 23, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 12, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 25, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: November 23, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: January 25, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 15, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: August 16, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: August 11, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: September 10, 2021MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - F/B PLT --- UP 8/12/2021
Date: August 11, 2021STIPULATION
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 30, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: July 27, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: October 13, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: November 24, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33122 PAGE 1347-1347
Date: December 01, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: October 12, 2021REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: October 12, 2021PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 4174984
Date: September 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 16, 202110/07/2021
Date: January 16, 204609/10/2021
Date: January 16, 203309/29/2021
Date: January 16, 203910/06/2021
Date: January 16, 204210/06/2021
Date: January 16, 204309/10/2021
Date: January 31, 202408/16/2021
Date: January 28, 202412/01/2021
Date: January 16, 205810/13/2021
Date: January 16, 204911/05/2021
Date: January 16, 205411/23/2021
Date: January 16, 205510/12/2021
Date: January 16, 205110/12/2021
Date: January 16, 205210/12/2021
Date: January 16, 205010/13/2021
Date: January 16, 204710/08/2021
Date: January 16, 205310/12/2021
Date: January 16, 204510/12/2021
Date: January 16, 204810/07/2021
Date: January 16, 204410/07/2021
Date: January 16, 204109/10/2021
Date: January 16, 203209/10/2021
Date: January 16, 203409/28/2021
Date: January 16, 203809/15/2021
Date: January 16, 203609/16/2021
Date: January 16, 203709/14/2021
Date: January 16, 203509/30/2021
Date: January 16, 204008/16/2021
Date: January 29, 202408/25/2021
Date: January 30, 202407/14/2021
Date: January 21, 202408/11/2021
Date: January 27, 202406/23/2021
Date: January 15, 202402/08/2021
Date: January 10, 202408/11/2021
Date: January 26, 202408/02/2021
Date: January 25, 202405/25/2021
Date: January 14, 202407/02/2021
Date: January 17, 202410/07/2020
Date: January 02, 202407/27/2021
Date: January 24, 202407/15/2021
Date: January 22, 202412/01/2020
Date: January 05, 202407/14/2021
Date: January 23, 202407/08/2021
Date: January 20, 202407/08/2021
Date: January 19, 202402/12/2021
Date: January 11, 202407/02/2021
Date: January 18, 202405/25/2021
Date: January 12, 202401/25/2021
Date: January 09, 202405/25/2021
Date: January 13, 202406/24/2021
Date: January 16, 202401/25/2021
Date: January 08, 202401/11/2021
Date: January 07, 202410/07/2020
Date: January 04, 202412/02/2020
Date: January 06, 202410/07/2020
Date: January 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2058 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 33122 PAGE 1347-1347 | |
January 16, 2057 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 16, 2056 | Docket Event | DA PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT | |
January 16, 2055 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 16, 2054 | Docket Event | ORDER CURLEY; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS; WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 11/5/2021 | |
January 16, 2053 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED - F/B DFT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC | |
January 16, 2052 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 16, 2051 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 16, 2050 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
January 16, 2049 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.