Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
V C A United Llc, filed a(n) Other Circuit case represented by James S Telepman, against Integrated Vascular Imaging Llc, Melissa L Hansler, represented by David K Markarian, Thomas J Ali, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Jeffrey J. Colbath presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey J. Colbath Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 100 |
CategoryOther Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by V.C.A. UNITED, LLC ("VCA") against the Defendants, Melissa L. Hansler and INTEGRATED VASCULAR IMAGING, LLC. VCA is seeking damages in excess of $30,000. VCA is a Florida limited liability company, while Melissa is a residen...
01/11/2022
Date: January 16, 12901/13/2022
Date: January 16, 12601/12/2022
Date: January 16, 13101/11/2022
Date: January 16, 12801/10/2022
Date: January 16, 199901/06/2022
Date: January 16, 12001/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11901/11/2022
Date: January 16, 13001/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11301/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11201/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11101/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10901/11/2022
Date: January 16, 12701/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10801/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10601/07/2022
Date: January 16, 12501/07/2022
Date: January 16, 12401/07/2022
Date: January 16, 12301/07/2022
Date: January 16, 12201/06/2022
Date: January 16, 12101/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10401/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10301/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10208/30/2021
Date: January 16, 197610/02/2021
Date: January 16, 198401/03/2022
Date: January 16, 199612/29/2021
Date: January 16, 199710/01/2021
Date: January 16, 198510/27/2021
Date: January 16, 199110/06/2021
Date: January 16, 198810/07/2021
Date: January 16, 198710/07/2021
Date: January 16, 199009/17/2021
Date: January 16, 198210/06/2021
Date: January 16, 198609/02/2021
Date: January 16, 197908/30/2021
Date: January 16, 197708/30/2021
Date: January 16, 197509/27/2021
Date: January 16, 198308/26/2021
Date: January 16, 197409/17/2021
Date: January 16, 198109/15/2021
Date: January 16, 198009/01/2021
Date: January 16, 197808/11/2021
Date: January 16, 207008/05/2021
Date: January 16, 206508/05/2021
Date: January 16, 206608/05/2021
Date: January 16, 206708/20/2021
Date: January 16, 207308/19/2021
Date: January 16, 207208/17/2021
Date: January 16, 207107/25/2021
Date: January 16, 206307/26/2021
Date: January 16, 206408/10/2021
Date: January 16, 206908/10/2021
Date: January 16, 206806/08/2021
Date: January 16, 204807/16/2021
Date: January 16, 206007/19/2021
Date: January 16, 206107/09/2021
Date: January 16, 205907/22/2021
Date: January 16, 206207/09/2021
Date: January 16, 205807/07/2021
Date: January 16, 205707/06/2021
Date: January 16, 205406/07/2021
Date: January 16, 204607/07/2021
Date: January 16, 205607/06/2021
Date: January 16, 205506/04/2021
Date: January 16, 204507/06/2021
Date: January 16, 205306/08/2021
Date: January 16, 204706/16/2021
Date: January 16, 205006/14/2021
Date: January 16, 204907/06/2021
Date: January 16, 205206/24/2021
Date: January 16, 205106/02/2021
Date: January 16, 204405/24/2021
Date: January 16, 204305/11/2021
Date: January 16, 204105/12/2021
Date: January 16, 204205/06/2021
Date: January 16, 204005/06/2021
Date: January 16, 203902/19/2021
Date: January 29, 202405/06/2021
Date: January 16, 203805/05/2021
Date: January 16, 203704/13/2021
Date: January 16, 203603/08/2021
Date: January 16, 203401/15/2021
Date: January 25, 202403/08/2021
Date: January 16, 203303/05/2021
Date: January 16, 203503/04/2021
Date: January 16, 203203/04/2021
Date: January 31, 202402/22/2021
Date: January 30, 202402/01/2021
Date: January 28, 202402/01/2021
Date: January 27, 202401/19/2021
Date: January 26, 202401/12/2021
Date: January 24, 202408/24/2020
Date: January 12, 202401/12/2021
Date: January 23, 202401/11/2021
Date: January 22, 202401/11/2021
Date: January 21, 202401/08/2021
Date: January 20, 202401/08/2021
Date: January 19, 202401/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10101/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10011/19/2021
Date: January 16, 199501/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11812/29/2021
Date: January 16, 199801/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11701/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11611/01/2021
Date: January 16, 199410/12/2021
Date: January 16, 198910/27/2021
Date: January 16, 199210/29/2021
Date: January 16, 199301/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11501/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11401/06/2022
Date: January 16, 11001/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10701/06/2022
Date: January 16, 10507/16/2020
Date: January 03, 202412/11/2020
Date: January 18, 202411/17/2020
Date: January 16, 202411/16/2020
Date: January 17, 202411/16/2020
Date: January 15, 202410/09/2020
Date: January 14, 202409/09/2020
Date: January 13, 202408/17/2020
Date: January 11, 202408/17/2020
Date: January 10, 202408/13/2020
Date: January 09, 202407/28/2020
Date: January 08, 202407/16/2020
Date: January 04, 202407/28/2020
Date: January 07, 202407/17/2020
Date: January 06, 202407/16/2020
Date: January 02, 202407/16/2020
Date: January 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2073 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO TRANSFER | |
January 16, 2072 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
January 16, 2071 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
January 16, 2070 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL | |
January 16, 2069 | Docket Event | ORDER ACCEPTING AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
January 16, 2068 | Docket Event | AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
January 16, 2067 | Docket Event | AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
January 16, 2066 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
January 16, 2065 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
January 16, 2064 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.