Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Attorney State filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kevin L Foley, represented by Mamie Washington Kendall, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with SANDRA BOSSOPARDO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSANDRA BOSSOPARDO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2007 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
03/07/2008
Date: April 28, 203302/14/2008
Date: April 25, 202403/14/2008
Date: April 28, 203703/07/2008
Date: April 28, 203403/25/2008
Date: April 28, 204103/25/2008
Date: April 28, 204004/28/2008
Date: April 28, 204902/08/2008
Date: April 21, 202402/05/2008
Date: April 17, 202402/04/2008
Date: April 15, 202402/20/2008
Date: April 26, 202402/06/2008
Date: April 18, 202402/08/2008
Date: April 22, 202402/20/2008
Date: April 28, 202403/07/2008
Date:03/25/2008
Date: April 28, 203904/18/2008
Date: April 28, 204402/14/2008
Date: April 24, 202402/20/2008
Date: April 27, 202404/28/2008
Date: April 28, 205306/06/2008
Date: April 28, 207004/28/2008
Date: April 28, 205404/28/2008
Date: April 28, 2055WAIVER
Date: April 18, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: April 18, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: April 28, 2008SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY
Date: March 07, 2008SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: March 25, 2008SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: March 25, 2008REQUEST
Date: April 28, 2008SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY
Date: April 28, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: February 04, 2008MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: February 06, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: February 08, 2008ORDER APPT SPECIAL COUNSEL
Date: February 08, 2008ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: February 05, 2008REPORT
Date: February 14, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: March 14, 2008SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: March 25, 2008SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: February 20, 2008SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: February 20, 2008PRAECIPE OF APPEAR/WAIVE ARR
Date: February 14, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: March 07, 2008WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Date: March 07, 2008SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: February 20, 2008PLEA SHEET
Date: April 28, 2008COURT EVENT FORM
Date: June 06, 2008WAIVER OF RIGHTS
Date: April 28, 200804/28/2008
Date: April 28, 205604/18/2008
Date: April 28, 204503/07/2008
Date: April 28, 2032Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2070 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
April 28, 2065 | Docket Event | CONVERSION HISTORICAL SENTENCE DOCKET | |
April 28, 2056 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY | |
April 28, 2055 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
April 28, 2054 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF RIGHTS | |
April 28, 2053 | Docket Event | PLEA SHEET | |
April 28, 2049 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
April 28, 2045 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
April 28, 2044 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
April 28, 2041 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.