Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Elizabeth Sacelaris, Nicholas Sacelaris, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Michael Beraha, against Ace Hardware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2008 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Elizabeth Sacelaris and Nicholas Sacelaris against defendant Ace Hardware Corporation. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant, resulting in injuries to Elizabeth Sacelaris. The incident occ...
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: May 28, 2008ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023799 PAGE 01488
Date: April 12, 2010COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2008MOTION
Date: June 01, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023799 PAGE 01488 FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (R ROSENBERG) |
|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER Associated to docket ODIS filed on 2010-04-12 |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME Filed by PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH SACELARIS |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL BERAHA |
|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 7/0/09 AT 8:30 AM R ROSENBERG |
|
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Filed by PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH SACELARIS |
|
May 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AMENDED AS TO SAME PARTIES Filed by PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH SACELARIS |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH SACELARIS |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH SACELARIS |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$255.00 was made on receipt CAMB194192. Filed by PLAINTIFF ELIZABETH SACELARIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.