Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Frank Petrusian, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Jayme Manzo Deere, against Bartogh Ahmadabadi, represented by Clark Wickham Smith, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2006 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
MOTION
Date: August 27, 2007ORDER
Date: February 25, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2008REQUEST
Date: October 30, 2007NOTICE
Date: July 06, 2007MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: September 11, 2007MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 16, 2007NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2007AGREED ORDER
Date: March 22, 2007AGREED ORDER
Date: February 13, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - GRANTED OBO DEFT BARTOGH AHMADABADI PLT TAKE NOTHING BY THIS ACTION DEFT GO HENCE W/O A DAY |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED AFTER HEARING Associated to docket ORD filed on 2008-02-25 |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by DEFENDANT BARTOGH AHMADABADI |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING IN-RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 2/25/08 |
|
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF Filed by DEFENDANT BARTOGH AHMADABADI |
|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON PLTF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF REC--GRANTED STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/17/07 . . . |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW Filed by PLAINTIFF FRANK PETRUSIAN |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 9/17/07 AT 8;45 AM ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF HEARING ON 9/10/07 |
|
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Filed by DEFENDANT BARTOGH AHMADABADI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.