Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
First 2 Aid Ems, Inc., filed a(n) Business Governance - Securities case against Luczywo, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBusiness Governance |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by First 2 Aid EMS, Inc. against Christopher Luczywo. First 2 Aid EMS is a Florida corporation that provides emergency medical transportation services. The complaint alleges that Luczywo, a former executive of the company, eng...
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE
Date: August 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 28, 2023DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF PLAINTIFF
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSELAND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 05, 2023VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 21, 2022PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 17, 2022DEFENDAT'S, CHRISTOPHER LUCZYWO, AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2022PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 09, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/14/2022
Date: October 21, 2022SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 01, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: August 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: August 09, 2022DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER LUCZYWO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2022PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE ORLANDO LAW GROUP, PL FROM REPRESENTING DEFENDANT
Date: September 07, 2022DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY
Date: August 05, 2022DEFENDANT'S, CHRISTOPHER LUCZYWO,MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2022PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT, CHRISTOPHER LUCZYWO
Date: February 24, 2023DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 13, 2023DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION
Date: March 23, 2023MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO GRANT ACCESS TO ONLINE DOCUMENTS
Date: April 09, 2023DEFENDANT'S AMENDED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION
Date: June 07, 2023SUBPOENA D/T FOR DEPOSITION, RETURNED, SERVED ON BRANDY LUCZYWO
Date: September 05, 2023PLAINTIFF’S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, CHRISTOPHER LUCZYWO
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF JENNIFER A ENGLERT
Date: September 08, 202210/13/2022
Date: May 03, 203710/11/2022
Date: May 26, 20249/7/2022
Date: May 03, 204210/17/2022
Date: May 03, 20468/5/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/9/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/5/2023
Date: May 02, 20248/17/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/1/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/4/2022
Date: May 03, 202410/10/2022
Date: May 04, 20244/28/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/13/2023
Date: May 06, 20244/11/2023
Date: May 03, 204411/17/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/9/2022
Date: May 03, 202410/31/2022
Date: May 28, 202410/12/2023
Date: May 05, 20246/7/2023
Date: May 06, 202411/13/2023
Date: May 08, 20249/5/2023
Date: May 03, 20243/23/2023
Date: May 04, 20248/4/2022
Date: May 30, 20248/15/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/16/2022
Date: May 27, 20242/24/2023
Date: May 29, 20245/18/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/15/2023
Date: May 01, 202411/1/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/9/2022
Date: May 04, 20249/8/2022
Date: May 04, 20245/26/2023
Date: May 02, 2024PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISWUALIFY THE ORLANDO LAW GROUP, PL FROM REPRESENTING DEFENDANT
Date: September 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2046 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2044 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2042 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2037 | Docket Event | ||
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.