Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Fanous, Liliana, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Feliciano, Danay, Llc, Speedway, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeARENDAS, CHRISTINE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 106 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiff, Liliana Fanous, is suing the defendants, Speedway LLC and Danay Feliciano, for damages. The complaint alleges that on...
1/4/2024
Date: April 02, 202411/3/2023
Date: April 25, 10611/7/2023
Date: April 01, 202411/3/2023
Date: April 12, 202411/1/2023
Date: April 24, 202411/3/2023
Date: April 08, 202411/17/2023
Date: April 25, 206111/17/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/12/2023
Date: April 04, 20248/8/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/5/2022
Date: April 04, 20241/5/2022
Date: April 05, 202410/12/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/10/2022
Date: April 02, 20248/7/2023
Date: April 04, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: January 10, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED W/ATTACHED GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: January 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2061 | Docket Event | ||
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.