Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ordonez Rodriguez, Aura Maria, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT $268.00 RECEIPT #2021095682
Date: October 27, 2021WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT
Date: October 27, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: October 27, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: September 30, 2021CITATION FILED AEE4TIE
Date: September 28, 202110/12/2021
Date: April 02, 202410/27/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/27/2021
Date: April 02, 20249/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/28/2021
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $268.00 RECEIPT #2021095682 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | * TO PAY COURT COSTS (FINE NOT INCLUDED) OF $268.00 (X) PAY TODAY - RECORDED (OR.6074.154. / 2021167058) | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.