We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Florida Vs. Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with HEARING OFFICER presiding.

Case Details for v. Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona

Judge

HEARING OFFICER

Filing Date

February 19, 2020

Category

Traffic

Last Refreshed

November 23, 2022

Practice Area

Criminal

Filing Location

Osceola County, FL

Matter Type

General Criminal

Parties for v. Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona

Case Documents for v. Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona

NOTICE OF ACTION REQUIRED

Date: September 27, 2021

NOTICE TO APPEAR

Date: September 29, 2021

SUBPOENA ISSUED

Date: September 29, 2021

HEARING REQUEST

Date: March 06, 2020

CITATION FILED A1JYZXP

Date: February 19, 2020

Case Events for v. Dennard, Shardaza Pashiona

Type Description
Docket Event
Docket Event
Docket Event
Docket Event
Docket Event
Docket Event LAW ENFORCEMENT REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
Docket Event DEFENDANT APPEARED DISMISSED AT OFFICERS REQUEST CASE DISMISSED
Docket Event TSPEED WAIVED $150.00
Docket Event TRSRSTF WAIVED $3.00
Docket Event TRASC WAIVED $12.65
See all events