Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Allen, Gary S, Allen, Yvette B, Blair, Roger C, Blair, Theresa L, Celebration Residential Owners Association Inc, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 121 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 07, 2020VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT&702.015(4)
Date: August 07, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2020SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: August 07, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: August 07, 2020PAYMENT $2,014.00 RECEIPT #2020061952
Date: August 11, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)
Date: November 17, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 8/29/2020@336PM PARTY SERVED: ANTONIA TOSCANO
Date: November 19, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 8/29/2020@336PM PARTY SERVED: THOMAS TOSCANO
Date: November 19, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 8/31/2020@1111AM PARTY SERVED: ROGER C BLAIR
Date: November 30, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 8/31/2020@1111AM PARTY SERVED: THERESA L BLAIR
Date: November 30, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR YVETTE B ALLEN
Date: December 02, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR GARY S ALLEN
Date: December 02, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YVETTE B ALLEN
Date: December 02, 2020PROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION SERVICE OF PUBLICATION
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR GARY S ALLEN
Date: December 07, 2020COPY OF AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: December 07, 2020DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK - NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: December 07, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: December 23, 2020NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 28, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2021DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS
Date: February 03, 2021PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2021PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2021ORDER SETTING NON-JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL
Date: March 29, 2021PLAINTIFF TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: April 02, 2021PLAINTIFF TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME EFFORT AND COSTS
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - COPY OF THE CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: May 14, 2021ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: May 19, 2021AMENDED ORDER SETTING NON JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL
Date: July 09, 2021PLAINTIFF TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ORDER SETTING NON JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL
Date: July 30, 2021PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME, EFFORT, AND COSTS
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF FILING -AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: September 15, 2021PLAINTIFF''S AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - COPY OF CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS
Date: September 24, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - RECORDED (OR.6054.1371. / 2021151308)
Date: September 29, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 08, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: November 18, 2021PLAINTIFF MOTION RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: December 28, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 14, 2022PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022000262
Date: January 03, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF''S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 21, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS
Date: April 14, 2022PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2022035889
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE - DENIED
Date: April 19, 2022ORDER DENIED ON DEFENDANT EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 19, 20222ND PRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE W/ORDER-FTJ
Date: April 19, 20222ND PRO SE ORDER EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE (DENIED)
Date: April 19, 2022PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2022036196
Date: April 19, 2022PAYMENT $119,900.00 RECEIPT #2022036266
Date: April 19, 2022PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2022036349
Date: April 19, 2022PAYMENT $1,230,057.50 RECEIPT #2022036364
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($1,330,000.00 GRACE REN)
Date: April 19, 2022DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SHORT MATTERS HEARING
Date: May 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 14, 2022CHECK REQUEST TO GRACE REN REFUND
Date: September 01, 2022MOTION TO INTERVENE BY GRACE REN 3RD PARTY PURCHASER
Date: September 10, 2022MOTION TO TAX THE COSTS OF THE REGISTRY FEE TO THE PLAINTIFF BY GRACE REN 3RD PARTY PURCHASER
Date: September 10, 2022E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - REOPEN FILING FEES
Date: September 12, 2022AGREED ORDER ON MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM THE COURT REGISTRY BY GRACE REN
Date: September 21, 2022CHECK REQUEST MAILED TO GRACE REN REFUND OVERPAYMENT
Date: September 23, 2022CHECK REQUEST SET ASIDE FOR GRACE REN (SEE EMAIL CORRESPONDCE REQUEST TO PICK UP)
Date: October 14, 2022ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: October 25, 2022PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023DEFENDANT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE
Date: February 09, 2023MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 13, 2023DEFENDANT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 13, 2023PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 14, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Date: May 04, 2023NOTICE OF FILING / WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: June 19, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 20 2023
Date: June 20, 2023AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: June 20, 2023DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2023PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 11, 2023LETTER TO JUDGE RE DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2023PLAINTIFF MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING
Date: October 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING
Date: November 22, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 06 2023
Date: December 05, 2023MOVANT EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE TO BRING THIRD PARTY CLAIM
Date: December 27, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: January 11, 2024PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: January 25, 2024LETTER TO JUDGE RE MOTION TO RELEASE ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: January 25, 2024PLAINTIFF ORDER TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Date: February 05, 20248/7/2020
Date: May 03, 20248/7/2020
Date: May 01, 20248/7/2020
Date: May 02, 20248/7/2020
Date: May 11, 20248/7/2020
Date: May 03, 20478/7/2020
Date: May 27, 202411/17/2020
Date: May 02, 202411/19/2020
Date: May 04, 20248/11/2020
Date: May 01, 20249/16/2020
Date: May 04, 202412/7/2020
Date: May 01, 202411/19/2020
Date: May 02, 202411/30/2020
Date: May 04, 202412/2/2020
Date: May 17, 20242/26/2021
Date: May 04, 202412/7/2020
Date: May 09, 202412/23/2020
Date: May 01, 202412/2/2020
Date: May 04, 202412/2/2020
Date: May 19, 20241/28/2021
Date: May 04, 20242/26/2021
Date: May 03, 20242/3/2021
Date: May 03, 202412/7/2020
Date: May 08, 20242/1/2021
Date: May 23, 20244/2/2021
Date: May 13, 20247/30/2021
Date: May 08, 20245/3/2021
Date: May 04, 20245/12/2021
Date: May 03, 20363/29/2021
Date: May 07, 20242/1/2021
Date: May 14, 20245/3/2021
Date: May 05, 20245/14/2021
Date: May 04, 20249/7/2021
Date: May 05, 20248/19/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/14/2021
Date: May 03, 1745/19/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/9/2021
Date: May 05, 20247/30/2021
Date: May 10, 20249/15/2021
Date: May 04, 202410/1/2021
Date: May 08, 20249/7/2021
Date: May 04, 20249/24/2021
Date: May 03, 1219/29/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/29/2021
Date: May 05, 202411/8/2021
Date: May 03, 202411/18/2021
Date: May 01, 202412/28/2021
Date: May 03, 20242/14/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/16/2022
Date: May 04, 20241/3/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/30/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/21/2022
Date: May 03, 20244/14/2022
Date: May 13, 20244/19/2022
Date: May 01, 20244/7/2022
Date: May 01, 20244/18/2022
Date: May 01, 20244/18/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/14/2022
Date: May 03, 20244/19/2022
Date: May 03, 20244/29/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/29/2022
Date: May 03, 20655/13/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/10/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/15/2022
Date: May 04, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/1/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/23/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/10/2022
Date: May 05, 20249/12/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/21/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 08, 202410/14/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 03, 20241/31/2023
Date: May 03, 202410/25/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/13/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/14/2023
Date: May 04, 20242/14/2023
Date: May 07, 20245/4/2023
Date: May 04, 20246/20/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/19/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/21/2023
Date: May 06, 20248/28/2023
Date: May 03, 20249/7/2023
Date: May 06, 202410/11/2023
Date: May 04, 202410/11/2023
Date: May 01, 202411/21/2023
Date: May 01, 202411/22/2023
Date: May 04, 202412/5/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/27/2023
Date: May 03, 202411/27/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/11/2024
Date: May 01, 20241/25/2024
Date: May 03, 20241/11/2024
Date: May 03, 20241/25/2024
Date: May 01, 20242/5/2024
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2065 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2047 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2036 | Docket Event | ||
May 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.