Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Burse, Patrick Lamar, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MORGAN, JON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN, JON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM
Date: July 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT $ 0 BOND VIOLATION REPORT
Date: April 26, 2021AMENDED VIOLATION OF PROBATION AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2021WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: May 24, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: July 20, 2021WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: February 08, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: February 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT $ 0 BOND VIOLATION REPORT
Date: February 03, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: January 25, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION
Date: December 23, 20202ND AMENDED VIOLATION OF PROBATION AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2021NOLLE PROSEQUI: COUNTS 2, 3, AND 4 ONLY
Date: January 25, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY
Date: December 09, 2020INFORMATION FILED
Date: October 13, 2020PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: January 25, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: December 23, 2020WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: September 09, 20207/20/2021
Date: April 01, 20242/2/2021
Date: April 05, 20246/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/28/2021
Date: April 04, 20242/19/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/20/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/23/2020
Date: April 02, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/24/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2020
Date: April 05, 202412/23/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/30/2020
Date: April 02, 20245/18/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/26/2021
Date: April 08, 20242/8/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/3/2021
Date: April 06, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 04, 20249/9/2020
Date: April 02, 202410/26/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/13/2020
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.