Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ditech Financial Llc F K A Green Tree Servicing Ll, Newrez Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of New York As Successor In Interest To Jp Mo, Jacobs, Jeffrey W., Jacobs, Melodie N., Pro Roofing & Associate, Inc., United States Of America On Behalf Of The Small Bu, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
1/15/2019
Date: May 03, 20241/15/2019
Date: May 01, 20241/15/2019
Date: May 02, 20241/15/2019
Date: May 06, 20241/15/2019
Date: May 31, 20241/16/2019
Date: May 10, 20241/17/2019
Date: May 01, 20241/24/2019
Date: May 02, 20241/24/2019
Date: May 03, 20241/28/2019
Date: May 03, 20242/5/2019
Date: May 05, 20242/6/2019
Date: May 02, 20242/26/2019
Date: May 04, 20242/26/2019
Date: May 09, 20242/27/2019
Date: May 03, 20243/1/2019
Date: May 03, 20243/4/2019
Date: May 02, 20243/6/2019
Date: May 04, 20243/15/2019
Date: May 13, 20244/1/2019
Date: May 10, 20244/1/2019
Date: May 05, 20244/4/2019
Date: May 01, 202412/12/2019
Date: May 03, 202412/30/2019
Date: May 05, 202412/30/2019
Date: May 06, 20241/2/2020
Date: May 08, 20241/2/2020
Date: May 06, 20241/6/2020
Date: May 04, 20241/7/2020
Date: May 02, 20241/7/2020
Date: May 04, 20241/8/2020
Date: May 14, 20241/8/2020
Date: May 04, 20241/16/2020
Date: May 03, 20241/27/2020
Date: May 02, 20241/20/2020
Date: May 04, 20241/29/2020
Date: May 05, 20242/3/2020
Date: May 31, 20241/31/2020
Date: May 08, 20243/4/2020
Date: May 03, 20243/16/2020
Date: May 01, 20243/30/2020
Date: May 03, 20244/2/2020
Date: May 02, 20244/7/2020
Date: May 05, 20242/3/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/18/2021
Date: May 04, 20248/19/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20248/25/2021
Date: May 06, 20249/24/2021
Date: May 03, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/7/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/18/2021
Date: May 14, 202410/18/2021
Date: May 03, 202410/18/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/21/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/14/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/28/2023
Date: May 03, 20244/28/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/1/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/2/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/3/2023
Date: May 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.