Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ramnarine, Kabir Richard, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with CARSTEN, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARSTEN, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2019 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
DOC PACKET
Date: January 20, 2021COURT ORDER REPORT OF DISPOSITION
Date: January 20, 2021DOC SENTENCE
Date: January 20, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: January 20, 2021FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT
Date: January 20, 2021NOLLE PROSEQUI: COUNTS 2 AND 3 ONLY
Date: January 20, 2021FELONY SENTENCE ORDER - RECORDED (OR.5874.779. / 2021009040)
Date: January 20, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: January 20, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: January 20, 2021RESTITUTION ORDER/NAME AND ADDRESS OF VICTIM
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: December 03, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2020MAIL RETURNED
Date: October 27, 2020FELONY COURT MINUTES/ORDER FIRST DAY OF TRIAL PERIOD ADDED
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: October 29, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISION OF AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: September 18, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: September 17, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: September 03, 2020WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: August 26, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 25, 2020AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE (AMENDED AS TO PTC)
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISION OF AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: March 16, 2020MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISION OF AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: February 04, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: January 03, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF PROVISION OF AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: November 08, 2019NOTICE OF PROVISION OF AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: December 16, 2019NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTION & CRIMINAL HISTORY
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: October 24, 2019NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST
Date: October 18, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: October 07, 2019NOTICE OF PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST
Date: October 03, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: October 03, 2019NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: October 03, 2019ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: September 16, 2019INFORMATION FILED
Date: September 13, 2019NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL
Date: September 19, 2019ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE- GRANTED
Date: June 20, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: September 18, 2019NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Date: May 21, 2019NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY
Date: September 18, 2019FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.
Date: May 20, 2019ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED
Date: May 20, 2019MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE (ROR)
Date: June 20, 20192/2/2021
Date: April 05, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 02, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 05, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2020
Date: April 01, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 04, 202412/3/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/29/2020
Date: April 01, 20249/17/2020
Date: April 02, 20249/3/2020
Date: April 02, 20245/13/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/27/2020
Date: April 02, 202412/3/2020
Date: April 02, 20245/11/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/16/2020
Date: April 01, 20245/8/2020
Date: April 01, 20243/9/2020
Date: April 01, 20249/18/2020
Date: April 01, 20243/4/2020
Date: April 01, 20248/26/2020
Date: April 01, 20241/3/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/16/2019
Date: April 01, 20242/4/2020
Date: April 01, 20248/25/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/16/2020
Date: April 01, 202411/15/2019
Date: April 01, 202411/8/2019
Date: April 01, 202412/11/2019
Date: April 01, 202410/24/2019
Date: April 01, 202410/7/2019
Date: April 01, 20249/18/2019
Date: April 04, 20249/18/2019
Date: April 01, 20249/16/2019
Date: April 01, 202410/18/2019
Date: April 01, 202410/3/2019
Date: April 04, 202410/3/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/20/2019
Date: April 07, 20249/19/2019
Date: April 02, 20246/20/2019
Date: April 03, 20245/21/2019
Date: April 01, 20245/20/2019
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.