Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Osceolasc Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cash, Adam T, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (15 MINUTES)
Date: July 18, 2022PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Date: July 19, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY
Date: July 21, 2022CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING (FTJ)
Date: July 11, 2022ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: July 18, 2022PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2022048007
Date: May 25, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/7/21 PARTY SERVED: ADAM T CASH
Date: October 08, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2022SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION
Date: October 04, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT (REC)
Date: December 28, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2018MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT BASED ON DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: October 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: October 18, 2018SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (REC)
Date: July 18, 2018SETTLEMENT STIPULATION / SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL (REC)
Date: July 18, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 01/04/18 PARTY SERVED: JANE DOE
Date: January 11, 2018SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL
Date: January 24, 2018SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: January 24, 2018SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: January 09, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: November 20, 2017$ 4776.46 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: November 20, 2017PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017110896
Date: November 21, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: November 20, 2017CONSENT OF DEFENDANT TO ENTRY OF GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2022CONTINUING GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT BY CONSENT - RECORDED (OR.6261.2420. / 2022118121)
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT OF DEFENDANT TO ENTRY OF GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CONTINUING GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT BY CONSENT - RECORDED (OR.6261.2420. / 2022118121) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (15 MINUTES) | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET FOR 08/01/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING (FTJ) | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 06/22/2022 @ 1:30PM PARTY SERVED: ADAM T CASH | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.