Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ellis H. Schauder, Ellis H. Schauder Noelia Velasquez Aao, Schauder Chiropractic And Wellness Center Noella Velasquez Aao, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lawrence Kopelman, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, represented by Marcy Aldrich, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Vincent Falcone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2020 |
CategoryCa - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Ellis H. Schauder, D.C., doing business as Schauder Chiropractic & Wellness Center, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, against Progressive Select Insurance Company. The lawsuit all...
Complaint
Date: January 23, 2020Summons Issued Electronically as to
Date: January 28, 2020Motion to Transfer
Date: March 16, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 23, 2020Notice Appearance of Counsel
Date: March 06, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: March 04, 2020Notice of Service of Process/Return
Date: February 10, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 02, 2020Request for Admissions
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Plan/Order - General Track
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 14, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: February 24, 2022Court Minutes
Date: July 27, 2020Order Denying
Date: July 27, 2020Response
Date: July 13, 2020Request
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: October 11, 2021Stipulation
Date: October 21, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Service
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Requirement for Case Management Plan and Order
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 06, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 31, 2022Case Management Plan/Order - General Track
Date: February 25, 2022Joint Case Management Report
Date: February 17, 2022Order
Date: December 01, 2021Order Granting
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 05, 2022Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: January 26, 2022Court Minutes
Date: February 22, 2022Correspondence
Date: December 20, 2021Motion
Date: January 26, 2022Letter
Date: January 26, 2022Motion
Date: December 20, 2021Motion for More Definite Statement
Date: March 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for More Definite Statement
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Plan/Order - General Track
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
February 22, 2022 | Hearing | Case Management Conference - Falcone, Vincent, III (Actual: Falcone, Vincent, III) | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Case Management Conference - Falcone, Vincent, III (Actual: Falcone, Vincent, III)
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Management Report
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Amend
Judge: Vincent Falcone |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.