Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stream Monkey Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Benjamin Iseman, against East Gate Productions Llc, Jayson Fuhlbruck, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Julie H O'Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2016 |
CategoryBc - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil Cover Sheet 51702139
Date: September 02, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 51740363
Date: September 07, 2016Notice of Service 52979355
Date: October 31, 2016Order Designating Case a Complex Case 52934328
Date: October 28, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 51740361
Date: September 07, 2016Order of Reassignment 52934332 Comments: to Div 32
Date: October 28, 2016Civil Cover Sheet 51702141
Date: September 02, 2016Order Setting Case Management Conference 52934331 Comments: 4/3/17 9:30
Date: October 28, 2016Voluntary Dismissal 54718460
Date: February 16, 2017Complaint 51702144
Date: September 02, 2016Notice to Parties 52934329
Date: October 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 54718460 | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Service 52979355 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Designating Case a Complex Case 52934328 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Reassignment 52934332 Comments: to Div 32 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference 52934331 Comments: 4/3/17 9:30 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Parties 52934329 | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued Electronically as to 51740363 | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued Electronically as to 51740361 | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet 51702139 | |
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet 51702141 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.