Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Marcelo Diaz, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Carlos Diez-Arguelles, against Adventist Health System Sunbelt Inc Florida Hospital Apopka Dba, Digestive And Liver Center Of Florida, P.A., Harinath Sheela, M.D., Junias Desamour, M.D., Mid-Florida Hospital Specialists, P.A., (total of 5) See All represented by Mary Jaye Hall, Patrick Telan, Rogelio Fontela, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Kevin B. Weiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2008 |
CategoryCa - Malpractice - Medical |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Exhibits in Support of 20222611 Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 28, 2011Memorandum 25442481 Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 31, 2012Motion for Trial 44986461 Comments: EXPEDITED; MARCELO DIAZ
Date: December 01, 2015Witness List 21967022 Comments: EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION AHS
Date: March 28, 2012Memorandum 57192370 Comments: OF LAW REGARDING SUBSEQUENT NEGLIGENT TORFEASORS
Date: August 27, 2017Response 56995014 Comments: IN OPPSITION
Date: August 14, 2017Order 25826635 Comments: ON D'S MTN IN LIMINE 2
Date: January 30, 2013Request to Produce 15338451 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 30, 2010Request to Produce 37624001
Date: February 04, 2015Motion 42509125 Comments: for court to enter trial deadlines - marcelo diaz
Date: August 20, 2015Motion to Compel 56009101 Comments: Mediation - Marcelo Diaz
Date: May 26, 2017Motion 58238968 Comments: for Hold and/or Stay Post Trial Rulings - Ptf. Marcelo Diaz
Date: November 20, 2017Disclosure of Experts 24186618 Comments: (NURSE)
Date: September 19, 2012Order 25826589 Comments: ON D'S MTN IN LIMINE 3
Date: January 30, 2013Order of Reassignment 22111807 Comments: from 39 TO 37/order of recusal
Date: April 10, 2012Disclosure of Experts 24442787 Comments: AMENDED
Date: October 09, 2012Response 56117911
Date: June 05, 2017Request to Produce 56561240
Date: July 11, 2017Motion In Limine 25396831 Comments: MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 21, 2012Motion to Compel 24587536 Comments: MEDIATION
Date: October 18, 2012Motion In Limine 25295266 Comments: MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 13, 2012Response 56995016 Comments: IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2017Motion to Compel 24711974 Comments: MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 29, 2012Order 25334732 Comments: CONTROLLING TRIAL
Date: December 18, 2012Mediation Report 44803524 Comments: no agreement was reached
Date: November 20, 2015Motion In Limine 25307120 Comments: MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 14, 2012Response 56995012 Comments: IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2017Motion In Limine 25307125 Comments: SIXTH MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 14, 2012Disclosure of Experts 33609967
Date: August 08, 2014Motion to Disqualify or Recuse 58143579 Comments: amended
Date: November 12, 2017Response 56134194
Date: June 06, 2017Motion In Limine 25307121 Comments: SECOND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 14, 2012Witness List 25311346 Comments: AMENDED WITNESS LIST ANNOTATED AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: December 17, 2012Motion 48353408 Comments: TO OBTAIN EXPEDITED TRIAL DATE; BY MARCELO DIAZ
Date: April 21, 2016Order 22091037 Comments: OF RECUSAL
Date: April 09, 2012Notice of Appeal 63416122
Date: December 26, 2018Motion for Trial 44512971 Comments: MARCELO DIAZ
Date: November 10, 2015Notice of Production of Non-Party 32827432
Date: July 02, 2014Motion to Appear by Phone 25669100 Comments: MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE
Date: January 17, 2013Motion In Limine 25307123 Comments: FOURTH MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 14, 2012Order 25487013 Comments: ON MOTION TO APPEAR VIA PHONE
Date: January 03, 2013Motion 27958164 Comments: (MARCELO DIAZ)
Date: July 12, 2013Order 22067411 Comments: GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: April 05, 2012Order 25826670 Comments: ON D'S MTN IN LIMINE 4
Date: January 30, 2013Motion 44111494 Comments: TO LIMIT DEFT EXPERTS; MARCELO DIAZ
Date: October 23, 2015Request to Produce 24865192 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: November 09, 2012Request to Produce 25311392 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: December 17, 2012Request to Produce 25311393 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: December 17, 2012Motion In Limine 25378222 Comments: MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 20, 2012Request to Produce 34891115
Date: October 06, 2014Disclosure of Experts 22017610 Comments: Disclosure of Experts
Date: April 02, 2012Motion 57267854 Comments: (second written motion) for mistrial by marcelo diaz
Date: August 31, 2017Request for Copies 44111471
Date: October 23, 2015Motion to Appear by Phone 44377782 Comments: Pltf Marcelo Diaz
Date: November 05, 2015Disclosure of Experts 43222330
Date: September 22, 2015Disclosure of Experts 28937451
Date: September 26, 2013Motion In Limine 57255129 Comments: regarding opinions of peter salomon md
Date: August 30, 2017Request to Produce 29177780
Date: October 14, 2013Response to Request to Produce 56550219
Date: July 11, 2017Request to Produce 25402753 Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL Request to Produce
Date: December 26, 2012Order 25826636 Comments: ORDER
Date: January 30, 2013Motion 22009825 Comments: FOR LATE DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: March 30, 2012Motion In Limine 25307124 Comments: FIFTH MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 14, 2012Order 25826629 Comments: ON D'S MTN IN LIMINE 1
Date: January 30, 2013Order 25555689 Comments: ON DEF'S SHEELA, M.D., AND DIGESTIVE LIVER CENTER OF FL, P.A.'S MIL
Date: January 09, 2013Motion In Limine 25307122 Comments: THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 14, 2012Letter 24870894 Comments: TO JUDGE
Date: November 13, 2012Request to Produce 25311391 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: December 17, 2012Response 29095412
Date: October 08, 2013Motion 50011370 Comments: AMENDED; TO OBTAIN EXPEDITED TRIAL DATE; MARCELO DIAZ
Date: June 27, 2016Motion for Protective Order 24770260 Comments: & RESPONSE TO PL'S AMENDED MTN TO COMPEL
Date: November 01, 2012Amended Notice of Appeal 63421884
Date: December 27, 2018Request to Produce 18996194 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF FOR SSA AUTHORIZATION
Date: October 27, 2011Notice of Appeal 58463008
Date: December 08, 2017Motion for Sanctions 57275517 Comments: plaintiff's
Date: September 03, 2017Joint Pre Trial Statement 25329213
Date: December 18, 2012Disclosure of Experts 22009813 Comments: Disclosure of Experts
Date: March 30, 2012Response 56995015 Comments: IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2017Response to Request to Produce 19184882 Comments: Response to Request to Produce
Date: November 11, 2011Request to Produce 23540929 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: August 01, 2012Response to Request to Produce 24617962 Comments: Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 23, 2012Memorandum 57091946 Comments: Regarding Pltf's Expert Dr. Eilio Lobato
Date: August 20, 2017Memorandum 57091947 Comments: Regarding Voir Dire
Date: August 20, 2017Request to Produce 23540710 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: August 01, 2012Motion to Disqualify or Recuse 58231982 Comments: (Pltfs Second)
Date: November 20, 2017Request to Produce 14687606 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 02, 2010Disclosure of Experts 14897146 Comments: Disclosure of Experts
Date: November 19, 2010Motion to Dismiss 15814331 Comments: PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2011Answer 16060645 Comments: TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2011Motion to Dismiss 16060653 Comments: AND OR STRIKE
Date: February 28, 2011Answer 17710761 Comments: AMENDED ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2011Response to Request to Produce 23983104 Comments: Response to Request to Produce
Date: September 04, 2012Interrogatories 24241695 Comments: EXPERT TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 24, 2012Request to Produce 24241696 Comments: EXPERT TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 24, 2012Witness List 24570817 Comments: DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: October 18, 2012Witness List 24571065 Comments: AHS AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: October 18, 2012Disclosure of Experts 24574764 Comments: FILED BY DEFENDANTS, JUNIAS DESAMOUR, M.D., ET AL.
Date: October 18, 2012MEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE 25282246 Comments: Mediation Report - Impasse
Date: December 13, 2012Motion In Limine 25308842 Comments: NUMBER 1
Date: December 14, 2012Motion In Limine 25308845 Comments: NUMBER 2
Date: December 14, 2012Motion In Limine 25308846 Comments: NUMBER 3
Date: December 14, 2012Motion In Limine 25308848 Comments: NUMBER 4
Date: December 14, 2012Notice of Compliance 25303621 Comments: WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 17, 2012Request to Produce 25347991 Comments: Request to Produce
Date: December 19, 2012Request to Produce 28966277
Date: September 30, 2013Disclosure of Experts 29000491 Comments: Substitution
Date: October 02, 2013Request to Produce 29033350
Date: October 03, 2013Response to Request to Produce 35107211
Date: October 14, 2014Response to Request to Produce 38528815
Date: March 12, 2015Notice of Mediation 42966918
Date: September 08, 2015Notice of Production of Non-Party 43780113
Date: October 12, 2015Motion to Amend 44217100 Comments: for Punitive Damages - Marcelo Diaz
Date: October 28, 2015Motion to Appear by Phone 44244862
Date: October 30, 2015Order Granting 44303408 Comments: TO APPEAR BY PHONE
Date: November 03, 2015Order Granting Telephonic Appearance 44379681
Date: November 05, 2015Order of Reassignment 44479467 Comments: from div 37 to div 33
Date: November 10, 2015Response 44772704 Comments: TO PLTFS MOTION FOR TRIAL DATE
Date: November 19, 2015Certification Settlement Authority 56276346
Date: June 19, 2017MEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE 56490189
Date: July 05, 2017Motion to Quash 56957197 Comments: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL
Date: August 10, 2017Response to Request to Produce 57036390
Date: August 15, 2017Response 57277238 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST WRITTEN MOTION FOR MISTRIAL
Date: September 04, 2017Response 57277239 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S SECONDWRITTEN MOTION FOR MISTRIAL
Date: September 04, 2017Petition or Motion to Strike 25415701 Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE (UNSIGNED)
Date: December 27, 2012Petition or Motion to Strike 25416416 Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 27, 2012Response to Request to Produce 25642916 Comments: Response to Request to Produce
Date: January 16, 2013Motion for Summary Judgment 25960936 Comments: Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 05, 2013Response to Request for Admissions 26038419 Comments: Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 14, 2013Response 26204349 Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 27, 2013Motion for Final Judgment 57423364 Comments: marcelo diaz
Date: September 18, 2017Response 57476371 Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2017Motion to Compel 57606670 Comments: production of settlement documents - by defendants
Date: October 02, 2017Order of Contempt 58082830
Date: November 08, 2017Notification of Rejection of Confidential Filing Request 58151101
Date: November 14, 2017Order Granting 58238792 Comments: Pltfs Motion to Hold and/or Stay Post Trial Rulings
Date: November 21, 2017Motion 60088875 Comments: TO LIFT STAY (AGREED)
Date: April 12, 2018Acknowledgment of Appeal 58530982 Comments: 5D17-3950
Date: December 15, 2017DCA Order 58532296 Comments: APPEAL IN ABEYANCE
Date: December 15, 2017Order on Motion 61139358 Comments: to vacate/reconsideration of contempt order
Date: July 06, 2018Motion for Mediation 61367957
Date: July 19, 2018Notice 62135462 Comments: DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL FILINGS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR POST TRIAL MOTIONS
Date: September 14, 2018Response 61384256 Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR MEDIATION
Date: July 20, 2018Order Dismissing Appeal 61747909 Comments: 5D17-3950
Date: August 20, 2018Order Granting 63095147 Comments: Defts Motion for New Trial
Date: November 30, 2018Acknowledgment of Appeal 63456233 Comments: 5D18-4023 (MEDIATION)
Date: December 31, 2018DCA Order Declining Referral to Mediation 63588613 Comments: 5D18-4023
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Inability to Produce the Record on Appeal 64330171
Date: March 05, 2019Order Dismissing Appeal 64700914 Comments: 5D18-4023
Date: April 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Case for Jury/Pretrial 68730010 Comments: ptc 12/1/2020 1:30 trial 1/4/2021
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Email Address 67641289
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Designation of Email Address 66819689
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien 66328658 Comments: sent to e-recording
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
July 11, 2019 | Hearing | Case Management - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.) | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Case Management - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.)
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes 66108139
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 65550660 Comments: JULY 11, 2019 @10:00 AM.
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Appeal 64700914 Comments: 5D18-4023
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Case Management Conference 64729250 Comments: by MARCELO DIAZ, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Herminia Diaz
Judge: Kevin B. Weiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.