Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cattle Ranch Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Green, Richard Paul, against Okeechobee County Board Of Cou, Okeechobee County Fire Rescue, in the jurisdiction of Okeechobee County, FL, . Okeechobee County, FL Superior Courts with WHITE, REBECCA IVY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITE, REBECCA IVY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOkeechobee County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 31, 2023COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, INJUNCTIVE, AND MONETARY RELIEF
Date: March 31, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: April 11, 2023COURT NOTES
Date: April 06, 2023EVIDENCE CHECK-IN RECEIPT
Date: April 28, 2023EVIDENCE DATA SHEET
Date: May 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE DATA SHEET | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE CHECK-IN RECEIPT | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CONTINUED HEARING | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS A,B,C,D,E,F,G & H | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 4/12/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge REBECCA WHITE presiding. | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CIRCUIT CIVIL HRG scheduled on 4/6/2023 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge REBECCA WHITE presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.