Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lopez, Hernan, Lopez, Ibetty, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Vargas, Andrew Joseph, against Weston Insurance Company, represented by Goldberg, Sarah R, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: September 07, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: March 15, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: April 20, 2022Motion:
Date: April 05, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: April 25, 2022Witness and Exhibit List
Date: April 25, 2022Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Hearing-
Date: December 27, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 30, 2021Request for Production
Date: February 28, 2022Privilege Log
Date: March 03, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: March 03, 2022(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 03, 2022Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount
Date: September 07, 2021Email Notice:
Date: April 05, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 08, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: September 07, 2021Response to Motion
Date: February 21, 2022Notice of Interrogatory
Date: February 28, 2022ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Filing:
Date: February 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO AMEND PLEADINGS BY INTERLINEATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Email Notice: EMAIL ADDRESS: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Privilege Log Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.