Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Medicta Health Corp, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gregory E Gudin, against Progressive American Insurance Company, represented by Diane Cullinan, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Medicta Health Corp on behalf of Isabel Suarez against Progressive American Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract for damages in excess of $8,000.01 but not exceeding $15,000. The plaintiff claims that...
Motion to Amend
Date: May 13, 2022Motion:
Date: May 11, 2022Memorandum of Disposition
Date: June 30, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: March 17, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 13, 2022Voluntary Dismissal
Date: May 26, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 15, 2022Agreed Order
Date: May 21, 2022Request for Copies
Date: May 11, 2022Request for Production
Date: March 17, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 09, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: May 11, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 18, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 26, 2021Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: November 01, 2021Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: November 02, 2021Complaint
Date: June 11, 2021Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 30, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (FILED 5132022) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- JUNE 30, 2022 AT 9:30AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO HAVE REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEEMED TIMELY FILED AND/OR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.