Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dominguez, Guillermo, Dominguez, Ingrid, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Calil, Jorge A., Esq, Juan P Gonzalez-Sirgo, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Canseco, Rebecca M., Esq, John H Richards, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2019 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Motion to Strike
Date: August 25, 2021Response to Motion
Date: December 07, 2021Response to Motion
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: December 13, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: August 25, 2021Agreed Order
Date: June 14, 2021Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: August 24, 2021Aff In Support of Mtn for Final/summary Judgment
Date: October 26, 2020Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 30, 2020Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 25, 2022Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: October 30, 2020Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: January 06, 2022Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: March 04, 2022Notice of Hearing Special Appt
Date: August 14, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 30, 2020Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: October 14, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 30, 2020Response to Motion
Date: November 18, 2021Order on Motion to Strike
Date: June 11, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 08, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Taking Video Deposition
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: April 26, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Taking Video Deposition
Date: March 24, 2021Order on Motion to Compel
Date: March 02, 2021Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 24, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: October 27, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: February 15, 2021Notice of Taking Video Deposition
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: August 14, 2020Order Setting Jury Trial with Mediation Referral
Date: May 08, 2020Order Resetting Jury Trial
Date: May 08, 2020Amended Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 22, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: March 23, 2020Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: September 09, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: January 12, 2021Amended Witness List
Date: October 22, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: August 12, 2020Notice of Filing:
Date: August 12, 2020Notice:
Date: November 03, 2020Request for Production
Date: October 22, 2020Affidavit in Support
Date: October 15, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Filing:
Date: April 09, 2020Order of Dismissal
Date: August 25, 2023Request:
Date: April 06, 2023Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: June 16, 2023Request:
Date: May 13, 2023Order Vacating Judgment
Date: June 16, 2023Order to Vacate Judgment
Date: June 16, 2023Motion:
Date: January 04, 2023Motion to Withdraw
Date: August 24, 2023Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 04, 2023Response to Motion
Date: July 13, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: May 06, 2022Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 24, 2023Motion to Amend
Date: June 27, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: May 06, 2022Motion for Leave
Date: May 14, 2023Subpoena For Trial
Date: October 04, 2022Request:
Date: May 16, 2023Voluntary Dismissal
Date: October 20, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: May 30, 2023Motion for New Trial
Date: January 13, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: July 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE VERDICT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT IN PLAINTIFFS' FAVOR, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion TO SET ASIDE VERDICT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT IN PLAINTIFFS' FAVOR, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Vacate Judgment Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment by Jury Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.