Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Grijak, Alexander, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rodriguez, Robert W., against Jw Marriott Marquis Miami, Met Ii Hotel, Llc, represented by Keif, Brian Stephen, Mark C Burton, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2001 |
CategoryComm Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This complaint is filed by Alexander Grijak against MET DU Hotel, LLC, doing business as JW Marriott Marquis Miami. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant, resulting in severe injuries to the plaintiff. The incident occurred on...
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received
Date: June 20, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 04, 2019Subpoena Returned
Date: February 19, 2019Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
Date: March 29, 2018ESummons 20 Day Issued
Date: June 21, 2017Notice of Filing:
Date: November 22, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Hearing-
Date: October 15, 2018Email Notice:
Date: July 13, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: October 10, 2017Request for Production
Date: July 24, 2017Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: November 12, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 24, 2017Subpoena Returned
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 29, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 23, 2017Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 03, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: July 13, 2017Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Notice of Interrogatory
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: July 13, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 02, 2018Order Extending Time for
Date: January 04, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 05, 2021Memorandum of Law
Date: October 27, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: January 04, 2021Request for Production
Date: January 04, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 15, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 20, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 04, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Unavailability/absence
Date: April 08, 2020Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Date: April 29, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: July 21, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: April 29, 2020Order Resetting Trial/Final Hearing
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Mediation Conference
Date: March 16, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: May 13, 2021Witness List
Date: May 11, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: April 08, 2021Order Setting Jury Trial
Date: August 24, 2020Order of Dismissal
Date: July 12, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 13, 2021Witness List
Date: June 10, 2021Order of Dismissal
Date: July 12, 2021Witness List
Date: January 11, 2021Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Hearing-
Date: November 30, 2020Exhibit List
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 15, 2020Witness List
Date: February 12, 2021Witness and Exhibit List
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Interrogatory
Date: February 12, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Hrg Special Appt
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Hearing-
Date: April 02, 2020Notice of Interrogatory
Date: October 15, 2020Case Management Report
Date: August 21, 2020Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: December 04, 2019Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: March 30, 2018Civil Cover
Date: June 16, 2017Notice of Interrogatory
Date: July 24, 2017Notice of Interrogatory
Date: November 04, 2019Service Returned
Date: June 27, 2017Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 26, 2019Notice:
Date: April 18, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: December 17, 2019Request for Production
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Production
Date: November 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: MET II HOTEL LLC; JW MARRIOTT MARQUIS MIAMI |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Witness List Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.