Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company N A, Mortgage Assets Management Series I Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Helen V Rolle, United States Of America On Behalf Of The Secreta, represented by Jean-Francois, James, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2017 |
CategoryRpmf -Homestead ($50,001 - $249,999) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion:
Date: November 01, 2017Order:
Date: January 29, 2019Order to Show Cause
Date: August 31, 2017Motion for Substitution of Parties
Date: November 08, 2018Motion:
Date: June 07, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: July 09, 2018Order:
Date: June 25, 2019Motion:
Date: August 24, 2017Complaint
Date: June 16, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: June 25, 2018Assignment of Bid
Date: May 28, 2019Order:
Date: June 27, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: August 27, 2018Response:
Date: September 24, 2018Response:
Date: May 07, 2018Court Correspondence Letter
Date: June 21, 2017Order on Motion to Strike
Date: September 25, 2018Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: July 18, 2019Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Date: January 04, 2021Final Judgment by Judge
Date: January 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order AO 20-21 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order 19-05 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued HANDED TO ATTORNEY Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: HELEN V ROLLE |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Check Mailed 86696 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Check Mailed 86695 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND WRIT OF POSSESSION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar THIRD PARTY PURCHASER'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND WRIT OF POSSESSION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID, P.L./86695 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, N.A./86696 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.