Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lange, Lisa, Sunshine Medical Health Services, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lewis J Mertz, against Equity Insurance Company, represented by Carabotta, Jill D., Esq, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Elijah A. Levitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Protection ($8,001 - $15,000) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is filed by Sunshine Medical Health Service, Inc. on behalf of Lisa Lange against Equity Insurance Company. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $5,000.01 but less than $14,999.99 for medical services provided to Lisa Lange between...
Order:
Date: November 12, 2018Order:
Date: April 20, 2020Subpoena
Date: December 11, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 29, 2018Memorandum of Disposition
Date: October 09, 2020Memorandum of Disposition
Date: November 01, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 30, 2015Request for Production
Date: June 30, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: July 06, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: July 06, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 17, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: August 31, 2015Answer and Affirmative Defense
Date: June 25, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2018Memorandum of Disposition
Date: March 01, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 30, 2018Motion:
Date: October 20, 2017Memorandum of Disposition
Date: November 08, 2017Order:
Date: November 08, 2017Memorandum of Disposition
Date: August 10, 2017Order:
Date: August 10, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: June 09, 2017Motion:
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: May 24, 2018Memorandum of Disposition
Date: May 24, 2018Complaint
Date: February 12, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: September 10, 2015Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 29, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: September 15, 2015Order on Motion to Compel
Date: September 02, 2015Request for Production
Date: February 12, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: September 10, 2015Notice of Production
Date: August 04, 2017Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: October 06, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: February 12, 2015Order:
Date: March 01, 2018Order:
Date: May 24, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2021 | Hearing |
Calendar Call Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 08, 2021 | Hearing | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM Due Date: Complete Date: | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference APRIL 8TH, 2021 BEFORE JUDGE ELIJAH A. LEVITT AT 09:00 AM. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial WEEK TRIAL PERIOD COMMENCING 05-17-2021 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Subpoena FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: OF CONFLICT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.