Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Avanti Homeowners Assn Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Vine, S. Jonathan, against Dupoux, Stephane, Evergreen Overseas Holdings Inc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with Caryn Canner Schwartz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2014 |
CategoryCondominium |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 25, 2014Order:
Date: September 30, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2014Order of Dismissal
Date: June 06, 2016Memorandum of Disposition
Date: November 19, 2014Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 22, 2015Order:
Date: December 22, 2015Motion for Continuance
Date: December 21, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: June 24, 2015Memorandum of Disposition
Date: May 18, 2016Memorandum of Disposition
Date: June 25, 2015Letter of Correspondence
Date: March 11, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: June 24, 2014Motion for Sanctions
Date: June 18, 2014Memorandum of Disposition
Date: September 30, 2014Memorandum of Disposition
Date: December 16, 2014Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 05, 2016Memorandum of Disposition
Date: December 22, 2015Order:
Date: May 07, 2014Motion for Continuance
Date: December 17, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 09, 2014Complaint
Date: April 28, 2014Order:
Date: April 28, 2014Motion:
Date: November 21, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 15, 2015Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Date: December 16, 2014Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.)
Date: January 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2018 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2018 | Hearing |
FWOP Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) *NO APPEARANCE (SRS STAMP INCLUDED) Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Evergreen Overseas Holdings Inc |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal (F.W.O.P.) *NO APPEARANCE (SRS STAMP INCLUDED) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO ENFORCE STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AND ADOPTING CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Dupoux Stephane |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal AND ADOPTING CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Order of Dismissal AND ADOPTING CONFIDENTIAL STIPULATION Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Cancellation Notice PLTF'S MTN FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT WED,, MAY 18TH, 2016 @ 10:30AM CT RM 2-9 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.