Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
St Felix, Daniel, St Felix, Edith, St Felix, Elisa, St Felix, Jenny, St Felix, Louis, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Product Liability case against 42Nd Oil Group Inc, Petrocity Service Station Llc, Philip Morris Usa Inc, Petro City U Gas, represented by Cruz-Alvarez, Frank, Salazar, David, Urbieta, Ignacio M., in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2014 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Edith St. Felix, as the personal representative of the estate of Wesner St. Felix, and on behalf of herself and Wesner St. Felix's six surviving children. The defendants in this case are Philip Morris USA, Inc., Petrocity S...
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: December 14, 2018Motion to Stay
Date: February 15, 2019Motion:
Date: June 25, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 23, 2019Order:
Date: February 26, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: January 29, 2019Request for Production
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 28, 2019Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: January 23, 2019Response:
Date: March 31, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 06, 2018Request for Production
Date: November 27, 2018Objection:
Date: November 30, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: July 02, 2018Order:
Date: November 17, 2017Request for Production
Date: November 21, 2018Order of Referral to Mediation Unit
Date: November 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: November 20, 2018Order on Case Management Plan
Date: September 04, 2018Order:
Date: November 09, 2018Motion:
Date: February 12, 2016Request for Production
Date: February 19, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: March 18, 2016Voluntary Dismissal
Date: February 10, 2020Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement
Date: October 22, 2019Complaint
Date: January 31, 2014Order:
Date: April 08, 2016Response to Request for Production
Date: July 25, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: October 03, 2019Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: September 20, 2019Response to Motion
Date: July 24, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: July 19, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: December 04, 2018Motion for Clarification
Date: August 15, 2017Response:
Date: April 01, 2016Response:
Date: August 31, 2017Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 23, 2016Response:
Date: October 30, 2015Order:
Date: January 07, 2016Answer
Date: January 19, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: January 18, 2016Motion:
Date: October 07, 2015Request for Production
Date: February 24, 2017Motion:
Date: February 02, 2017Response to Request for Production
Date: March 31, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 23, 2015Order:
Date: June 16, 2015Order of Dismissal
Date: July 24, 2015Motion to Strike
Date: June 12, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 12, 2015Order:
Date: April 10, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: October 21, 2014Letter of Correspondence
Date: May 22, 2014Motion:
Date: May 29, 2015Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: November 20, 2014Notice of Answer to Interrogatories
Date: March 19, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: November 19, 2014Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 18, 2014Motion:
Date: May 08, 2014Motion:
Date: May 07, 2014Request for Production
Date: October 21, 2014Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: April 02, 2015Order:
Date: December 18, 2018Order:
Date: August 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing: EVIDENTIARY HEARING MATERIALS FROM GARCIA V. PHILIP MORRIS USA INC. Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Answer to Interrogatories Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Interrogatory Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.