Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abia, Kate Arit Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Charles Mustell, against Atwater, Steven G, Flanders, Bertha, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Court Order (Recordable)
Date: December 17, 2008Final Order Removing Case From Printout
Date: December 17, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Order (Recordable) B: 26695 P: 2834 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Final Order Removing Case From Printout B: 26695 P: 1189 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Atwater Steven G; Flanders Bertha |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Final Order Removing Case From Printout B: 26695 P: 1189 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Recorded Document B: 26702 P: 1763 STIPULATION & ORDER FOR DISMISSAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial 04/06/2009 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial JURY TRIALS 04/28/2008 09:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO BE EXCUSED FROM SPECIFIC TIME PERIOD Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Multiple Subpoenas Filed 3 Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.