Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Greer, Frederick Charles Iii, Greer, Melissa Anne, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Aubin, Thomas G, Fieger, Geoffrey N, Richardson, Adam J, Silva, Paul M, Somera, Peter J Esq, (total of 6) See All against Cardiology Associates Of Stuart Pa, Chaudhry, Kunal Md, Martin Medical Center Inc, represented by Podolnick, Matthew, Puya, Keith J, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, FL, . Martin County, FL Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 100 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice-Medical |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMartin County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY:
Date: February 08, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL; SIGNED 3.3.22:
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 3.3.22 AT 9:15 AM:
Date: February 24, 2022PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL:
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: December 29, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ANDREW GARRETT ON DECEMBER 30, 2021
Date: December 29, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET A DATE CERTAIN FOR TRIAL
Date: March 14, 2022ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DATES FOR UPDATED DEPOSITIONS; SIGNED 02.10.2022
Date: February 10, 2022PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO SEVENTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 01, 202212/21/2022
Date: April 30, 1294/7/2022
Date: April 03, 20243/23/2022
Date: April 02, 20245/9/2022
Date: April 03, 20242/28/2022
Date: April 08, 20243/4/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/31/2022
Date: April 03, 20243/1/2022
Date: April 03, 20243/14/2022
Date: April 03, 20243/23/2022
Date: April 03, 20242/17/2022
Date: April 10, 20245/4/2023
Date: April 03, 20245/4/2023
Date: April 05, 20245/12/2023
Date: April 04, 202412/21/2022
Date: April 30, 20375/15/2023
Date: April 05, 20242/15/2022
Date: April 18, 20242/24/2022
Date: April 03, 202412/9/2021
Date: April 17, 202412/7/2021
Date: April 04, 202410/25/2022
Date: April 03, 202410/18/2022
Date: April 03, 202411/4/2022
Date: April 03, 202410/20/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/20/2022
Date: April 05, 202410/19/2022
Date: April 04, 202410/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/30/2022
Date: April 02, 20248/17/2022
Date: April 02, 20248/11/2022
Date: April 04, 20246/21/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/8/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/27/2023
Date: April 03, 20241/28/2022
Date: April 30, 6394/27/2023
Date: April 03, 20242/3/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/7/2023
Date: April 04, 202412/30/2022
Date: April 03, 202412/29/2022
Date: April 03, 20242/8/2022
Date: April 03, 20242/3/2022
Date: April 05, 20241/24/2022
Date: April 09, 20241/11/2022
Date: April 11, 20241/14/2022
Date: April 04, 20241/19/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/18/2022
Date: April 08, 202412/16/2021
Date: April 04, 20246/9/2021
Date: April 04, 202412/29/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/20/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/21/2022
Date: April 09, 202412/6/2022
Date: April 01, 202412/2/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/3/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/6/2021
Date: April 03, 20243/17/2021
Date: April 03, 20244/12/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/1/2021
Date: April 02, 20243/8/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/25/2021
Date: April 08, 20241/22/2021
Date: April 04, 20242/24/2021
Date: April 02, 20243/11/2021
Date: April 16, 20243/11/2021
Date: April 09, 20242/19/2021
Date: April 01, 20242/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20242/18/2021
Date: April 02, 20243/25/2021
Date: April 02, 20241/12/2021
Date: April 03, 20243/19/2021
Date: April 09, 20241/19/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/3/2021
Date: April 03, 20242/17/2021
Date: April 11, 20241/15/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/12/2021
Date: April 02, 20242/22/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/29/2021
Date: April 22, 20241/29/2021
Date: April 05, 20241/27/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/30/2020
Date: April 06, 202412/21/2020
Date: April 14, 20241/19/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/31/2020
Date: April 03, 20241/11/2021
Date: April 03, 202412/18/2020
Date: April 02, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 05, 202412/29/2020
Date: April 08, 202412/10/2020
Date: April 03, 202412/11/2020
Date: April 02, 202412/10/2020
Date: April 17, 202411/23/2020
Date: April 18, 202411/23/2020
Date: April 13, 202411/18/2020
Date: April 10, 202411/20/2020
Date: April 08, 20241/11/2021
Date: April 24, 202411/12/2020
Date: April 09, 202411/12/2020
Date: April 03, 202411/3/2020
Date: April 02, 202411/9/2020
Date: April 03, 20241/7/2021
Date: April 05, 202412/23/2020
Date: April 07, 20241/4/2021
Date: April 03, 202410/29/2020
Date: April 08, 202410/30/2020
Date: April 02, 202411/24/2020
Date: April 04, 202410/27/2020
Date: April 07, 202411/30/2020
Date: April 05, 202412/2/2020
Date: April 03, 202411/24/2020
Date: April 01, 202411/24/2020
Date: April 02, 202410/21/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/26/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/27/2020
Date: April 04, 202410/23/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/20/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/12/2020
Date: April 04, 20249/16/2020
Date: April 03, 202411/23/2020
Date: April 30, 2769/14/2020
Date: April 04, 20249/10/2020
Date: April 08, 20249/11/2020
Date: April 01, 20249/15/2020
Date: April 03, 202411/18/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/12/2020
Date: April 07, 20248/5/2020
Date: April 16, 202410/8/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/30/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/2/2020
Date: April 04, 202410/6/2020
Date: April 07, 20249/25/2020
Date: April 03, 202410/28/2020
Date: April 02, 20249/8/2020
Date: April 01, 202410/27/2020
Date: April 03, 20249/1/2020
Date: April 05, 20249/1/2020
Date: April 02, 202410/13/2020
Date: April 03, 20249/9/2020
Date: April 08, 20249/10/2020
Date: April 03, 20249/21/2020
Date: April 03, 20249/21/2020
Date: April 20, 20248/18/2020
Date: April 03, 20247/23/2020
Date: April 01, 20247/23/2020
Date: April 02, 20249/14/2020
Date: April 03, 20248/28/2020
Date: April 02, 20248/17/2020
Date: April 03, 20247/17/2020
Date: April 02, 20247/7/2020
Date: April 02, 20247/7/2020
Date: April 14, 20248/28/2020
Date: April 03, 20248/27/2020
Date: April 19, 20247/7/2020
Date: April 04, 20247/2/2020
Date: April 04, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 07, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 20, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 05, 20245/7/2020
Date: April 01, 20246/10/2020
Date: April 10, 20246/10/2020
Date: April 03, 20245/7/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 09, 20243/23/2020
Date: April 06, 20243/20/2020
Date: April 04, 20246/23/2020
Date: April 04, 20246/18/2020
Date: April 03, 20245/7/2020
Date: April 11, 20243/5/2020
Date: April 25, 20243/20/2020
Date: April 07, 20243/30/2020
Date: April 04, 20245/8/2020
Date: April 03, 20246/9/2020
Date: April 01, 20245/7/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/30/2020
Date: April 09, 20244/2/2020
Date: April 22, 20243/31/2020
Date: April 03, 20244/20/2020
Date: April 12, 20244/15/2020
Date: April 30, 20354/17/2020
Date: April 05, 20244/17/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/25/2020
Date: April 02, 20244/16/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/27/2020
Date: April 09, 20243/25/2020
Date: April 29, 20243/25/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/25/2020
Date: April 17, 20247/6/2020
Date: April 01, 20246/11/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/11/2020
Date: April 02, 20246/10/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/10/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/25/2020
Date: April 01, 20245/18/2020
Date: April 03, 20246/8/2020
Date: April 03, 20246/9/2020
Date: April 03, 20244/13/2020
Date: April 04, 20244/8/2020
Date: April 04, 20244/13/2020
Date: April 03, 20244/10/2020
Date: April 04, 20242/25/2020
Date: April 02, 20244/6/2020
Date: April 09, 20244/3/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/2/2020
Date: April 30, 19955/18/2020
Date: April 07, 20246/8/2020
Date: April 08, 20246/8/2020
Date: April 02, 20245/13/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/5/2020
Date: April 01, 20245/6/2020
Date: April 04, 20244/23/2020
Date: April 03, 20245/5/2020
Date: April 03, 20245/8/2020
Date: April 07, 20244/30/2020
Date: April 03, 20245/1/2020
Date: April 01, 20245/13/2020
Date: April 01, 20244/30/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/10/2020
Date: April 02, 20244/22/2020
Date: April 11, 20244/23/2020
Date: April 02, 20242/28/2020
Date: April 13, 20243/30/2020
Date: April 08, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 04, 20242/21/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 11, 20242/21/2020
Date: April 03, 20242/28/2020
Date: April 02, 20242/24/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 12, 20242/21/2020
Date: April 01, 20242/21/2020
Date: April 04, 20243/24/2020
Date: April 18, 20243/19/2020
Date: April 09, 20243/20/2020
Date: April 14, 20243/19/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/20/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/17/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/17/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/16/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/13/2020
Date: April 02, 20243/12/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/13/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/6/2020
Date: April 03, 20243/6/2020
Date: April 30, 20343/4/2020
Date: April 27, 20243/2/2020
Date: April 05, 20242/18/2020
Date: April 02, 20247/13/2020
Date: April 03, 20242/18/2020
Date: April 14, 20244/28/2020
Date: April 30, 20412/19/2020
Date: April 02, 20242/17/2020
Date: April 03, 20242/17/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/2/2021
Date: April 02, 202412/7/2022
Date: April 03, 202412/19/2022
Date: April 17, 202412/19/2022
Date: April 10, 202412/19/2022
Date: April 07, 202411/24/2021
Date: April 04, 202412/1/2021
Date: April 04, 202411/3/2021
Date: April 03, 202410/28/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/22/2021
Date: April 04, 20241/13/2022
Date: April 16, 202411/29/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/11/2022
Date: April 07, 202411/14/2022
Date: April 02, 20241/10/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/25/2022
Date: April 30, 20332/11/2022
Date: April 02, 20242/14/2022
Date: April 06, 20241/25/2022
Date: April 03, 20248/17/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/3/2022
Date: April 30, 20507/9/2021
Date: April 07, 20245/28/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/1/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/19/2021
Date: April 03, 20241/3/2022
Date: April 30, 20567/9/2021
Date: April 19, 20246/21/2021
Date: April 09, 20247/13/2021
Date: April 25, 20246/21/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/15/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/30/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/25/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/20/2021
Date: April 13, 20245/19/2021
Date: April 04, 20248/9/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/29/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/24/2021
Date: April 03, 20249/2/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/17/2021
Date: April 08, 20245/17/2021
Date: April 06, 20246/17/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/28/2021
Date: April 04, 20245/3/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/11/2021
Date: April 03, 20246/15/2021
Date: April 03, 20244/27/2021
Date: April 07, 20246/11/2021
Date: April 08, 20245/17/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/13/2021
Date: April 07, 20245/5/2021
Date: April 24, 20245/5/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/27/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/19/2021
Date: April 03, 20243/24/2021
Date: April 22, 20243/19/2021
Date: April 03, 20244/27/2021
Date: April 03, 20244/27/2021
Date: April 05, 20243/9/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/27/2021
Date: April 04, 20243/2/2021
Date: April 30, 20243/10/2021
Date: April 30, 20244/16/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/22/2021
Date: April 06, 20244/22/2021
Date: April 03, 20243/22/2021
Date: April 05, 20243/17/2021
Date: April 09, 20243/9/2021
Date: April 07, 20243/4/2021
Date: April 04, 20243/4/2021
Date: April 03, 20245/3/2021
Date: April 04, 20244/15/2021
Date: April 05, 20244/6/2021
Date: April 07, 20243/15/2021
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2073 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2072 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2071 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2066 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2064 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2063 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2053 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2050 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.