Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Deluca, Orlando, against Gunter, Jack Gerard, Gunter, Patricia Ann, Rayner, Rhonda D, Rayner, William W, Unknown Spouse Of Jack Gerard, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with MUSLEH, VICTOR JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2019 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Forecl $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 27, 2019EFILED LIS PENDENS
Date: November 27, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 27, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 27, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 27, 2019RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM
Date: November 27, 2019MOTION-MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF AD LITEM
Date: January 17, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA MICHELLE MAY
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK GERARD GUNTER
Date: January 21, 2020ORDER APPOINTING AD LITEM
Date: January 23, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR WILLIAM W RAYNER
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR PATRICIA ANN GUNTER
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JACK GERARD GUNTER
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT RHONDA D RAYNER
Date: January 21, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 06, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA ANN GUNTER
Date: January 22, 2020MOTION-MOTION FOR DISCHARGE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: February 14, 2020EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: February 06, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: September 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: February 06, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: February 06, 2020ANSWER OF AD LITEM
Date: February 06, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: February 11, 2020AMENDED ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2021ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 14, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2021EFILED SUMMONS
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORE TENUS TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: December 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: October 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: November 05, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 09, 2022ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 01, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROBERT LEE RAYNOR
Date: March 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: March 04, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO ELIZABETH NARRON
Date: March 01, 2022RESPONSE FILED BY JAMES CURRAN
Date: March 25, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOSHUA GUNTER
Date: March 24, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ELIZABETH NARRON
Date: March 24, 2022EFILED SUMMONS
Date: April 11, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WILLIAM RAY RAYNOR
Date: March 24, 2022ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOSHUA GUNTER
Date: April 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: April 25, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER GUNTER
Date: March 24, 2022RESPONSE FILED BY DEF HEATHER NICOLE GUNTER
Date: March 25, 2022RESPONSE FILED BY DEF JOSH GUNTER
Date: March 25, 2022ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: April 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFT HEATHER GUNTER ANSWER TO PLTFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JOSHUA GUNTER | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING HEARING | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILED SUMMONS | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 734557 | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FILED BY JAMES CURRAN | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FILED BY DEF HEATHER NICOLE GUNTER | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FILED BY DEF JOSH GUNTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.