Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Quince, Natasha, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Capone Cltrl, Us Bank National Association, represented by Pillay, Chantal Mercia, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Natasha Y. Quince of Gold Point Investments, LLC against US Bank and CapOne CLTRL Assignee of Fig 2233. The complaint requests a declaratory judgment and disbursement of surplus funds from a tax deed sale that took place on...
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 20, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 19, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 19, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CAPONE CLTRL
Date: December 18, 2019DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: January 03, 2020MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: February 17, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: January 02, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY THE DEFENDANT US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: January 06, 2020EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF NATASHA Y QUINCE
Date: January 02, 2020MOTION-MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT FILED BY DEFT US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: January 09, 2020STIPULATION FOR ORDER DISBURSING SURPLUS FUNDS
Date: February 26, 2020EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF NATASHA Y QUINCE
Date: January 02, 2020ORDER SETTING ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 17, 2020ORDER DISTRUBUTING SURPLUS FUNDS
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 17, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: February 17, 2020MOTION-REQUEST FOR HEARING
Date: February 17, 2020CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY US BANK NA - WITH ATTACHMENT
Date: March 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISTRUBUTING SURPLUS FUNDS | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY US BANK NA - WITH ATTACHMENT | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ORDER DISBURSING SURPLUS FUNDS | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-REQUEST FOR HEARING | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.