Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fizer, Mikle, Griebling Fizer, Rachel, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Jandy, Marc, against American Integrity Insurance C, represented by Carnes, Rachelle Sue, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with Gary L. Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil-Insurance Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 12, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 12, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 12, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 12, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 11.14.19
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 12, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 12, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 12, 2019ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: December 04, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: November 20, 2019ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY
Date: January 10, 2020PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: January 15, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: January 15, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND FILED BY PLTFS
Date: February 24, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: February 24, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: February 24, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 30, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 15, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTFS MIKLE FIZER AND RACHEL GRIEBLING FIZER
Date: April 17, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 18, 2020ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL CONT SEE DOC
Date: July 07, 2020ORDER ON PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL IN CAMERA INSPECTION
Date: July 07, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY THE PLAINTIFF
Date: August 10, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 06, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: August 21, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AMENDED FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Date: September 10, 2020AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION CONT SEE DOC
Date: September 18, 2020AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 11, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 16 2020 AT 9 30 AM WITH JUDGE SCOTT
Date: September 15, 2020FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTFS MIKLE FIZER AND RACHEL GRIEBLING FIZER
Date: November 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTFS MIKLE FIZER AND RACHEL GRIEBLING FIZER | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTFS MIKLE FIZER AND RACHEL GRIEBLING FIZER | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION CONT SEE DOC | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR SEPTEMBER 16 2020 AT 9 30 AM WITH JUDGE SCOTT | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AMENDED FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTFS MIKLE FIZER AND RACHEL GRIEBLING FIZER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.