Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Otto, Paul, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Hagood, Katha, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT KATHA HAGOOD
Date: November 12, 2019WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT KATHA HAGOOD
Date: January 13, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 06, 2019PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT FROM REAL ESTATE
Date: November 06, 2019DEED- CORPORATE WARRANTY
Date: November 06, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 06, 2019RECEIPT-FILING FEES
Date: November 06, 2019ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE FILED BY PLTF KATHA HAGOOD
Date: December 02, 2019ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EJECTMENT
Date: December 02, 2019MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF PAUL OTTO
Date: December 02, 2019PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: December 02, 2019WRIT ISSUED
Date: December 06, 2019CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT KATHA HAGOOD | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE FILED BY PLTF KATHA HAGOOD | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EJECTMENT | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF PAUL OTTO | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT KATHA HAGOOD | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT FROM REAL ESTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.