Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Phillips Chrysler Jeep Dodge I, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Metcalf, John D., against Martin, Jay M, Martin, Sandra J, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, FL, . Marion County, FL Superior Courts with SANDERS, GARY LAMAR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMarion County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Phillips Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Inc., a Florida corporation, against Jay M. Martin and Sandra J. Martin, individually. The complaint alleges two counts: issuance of a worthless payment instrument and breach of contract. The p...
PETITION/COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 06, 2019EFILED SUMMONS
Date: November 06, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 06, 2019EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC
Date: December 03, 2019NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2019EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC
Date: December 03, 2019MOTION-MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC
Date: March 12, 2020CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE
Date: January 16, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: December 10, 2019CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED
Date: February 10, 2020CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE
Date: March 25, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 25, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC
Date: June 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Reopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 06/25/2020 | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE-NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION-MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLTF PHILLIPS CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE INC | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 03/12/2020 | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $6.00 | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $2.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.