Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Leon County. This case was filed in Leon County Superior Courts with COOPER, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOOPER, JOHN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2022 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLeon County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
WITNESS LIST
Date: December 04, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: December 04, 2023EVIDENCE ENTERED AT HEARING
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 29, 2023EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING
Date: September 06, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 01, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT BEVERLY A WOODSON
Date: September 11, 2023ORDER DENYING
Date: September 06, 2023ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT BEVERLY A. WOODSON
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 11, 2022MOTION TO ENFORCE MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: October 10, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED
Date: October 10, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: September 09, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 05, 2022PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: September 07, 2022MEDIATION REPORT
Date: September 09, 2022DEFENDANT, BEVERLY A. WOODSONS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 10, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 15, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 15, 2022DEFENDANT BEVERLY A. WOODSONS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: August 29, 2022PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR INSPECTION OF PREMISES
Date: August 24, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: August 23, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: July 05, 2022PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 05, 2022DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, CYPRESS RESTORATION, INC.
Date: July 14, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: July 13, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- B WOODSON
Date: May 09, 2022PAYMENT $419.00 RECEIPT #1637146
Date: May 06, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2022LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR 5731.1006 / 20220030949)
Date: May 05, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 05, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE ENTERED AT HEARING | |
December 04, 2023 | Hearing | MOTION HEARING | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/04/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 3D, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/04/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 365B, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT BEVERLY A WOODSON | |
September 07, 2023 | Hearing | MOTION HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.