Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ian Holmes, Lara Diskin, Sean Whaley, Thomas Hart, against Curcio Family Ventures Llc, Dennis Macfarlane, Patricia Macfarlane, Pelican Landing Community Association Inc, represented by Ian Holmes, Lara Diskin, Sean Whaley, Thomas Hart, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph C Fuller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph C Fuller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryCa Homestead Residential Foreclosure 2: $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 31, 2017Motion to Release Originals
Date: August 30, 2017Final Disposition Form
Date: August 30, 2017Voluntary Dismissal
Date: August 25, 2017Motion to Release Originals
Date: August 23, 2017Final Disposition Form
Date: August 23, 2017Notice
Date: July 12, 2017Withdrawal of Motion
Date: June 29, 2017Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 07/13/17 @ 9:00
Date: June 29, 2017Notice of Hearing 8/16/17 @ 1:30 pm
Date: June 28, 2017Notice of Hearing 07/13/17 @ 9:00
Date: June 26, 2017Motion to Withdraw
Date: June 23, 2017Notice of Mediation
Date: May 31, 2017Certificate of Service
Date: May 19, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 19, 2017Minutes
Date: May 04, 2017Motion
Date: May 03, 2017Affidavit in Opposition to MFSJ - with Notice of Filing
Date: May 02, 2017Memorandum of Opposition to MFSJ
Date: May 02, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: May 02, 2017Notice of Filing
Date: April 20, 2017Affidavit of Attorneys Fees
Date: April 20, 2017Notice of Hearing 05/04/17 @ 9:00
Date: April 07, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 31, 2017Affidavit of Costs
Date: March 30, 2017Affidavit of Indebtedness/Amount Due
Date: March 30, 2017Affidavit
Date: March 30, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 30, 2017Notice of Filing
Date: March 29, 2017Affidavit of Indebtedness/Amount Due
Date: March 29, 2017Reply
Date: March 20, 2017Affidavit of Lost or Destroyed Instruments w/Notice of Filing
Date: February 27, 2017Notice of Dropping Party
Date: February 20, 2017Affidavit of Non-Military Service/Military Service with Notice of Filing
Date: February 15, 2017Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial
Date: February 14, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 13, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 27, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: January 26, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 26, 2017Notice of Appearance
Date: January 19, 2017Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 19, 2017Return of Service on Summons Unserved
Date: January 16, 2017Return of Service on Summons Served
Date: January 16, 2017Notice for Homestead Foreclosure Cases
Date: January 03, 2017Standing Order in Residential Foreclosure Cases
Date: January 03, 2017Summons Submitted for Issuance - New Case issued
Date: December 30, 2016Attachments/Exhibits to Pleading Copy of Standing Order
Date: December 30, 2016Complaint
Date: December 30, 2016Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 30, 2016Value of Claim Calculation Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event | No Original Documents Filed mailed letter to pltf. atty | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Release Originals | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Releasing Original Documents | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Release Originals | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order on Case Management Conference | |
August 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Circuit Civil Court
Judge: Rosman, Jay B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.