Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Matlacha Pine Island Fire Control District, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case against Constance Sissons, Lee County Tax Collector, Mark Sissons, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2008 |
CategoryCa Eminent Domain |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
This complaint is a petition in eminent domain filed by the Matlacha/Pine Island Fire Control District against Mark A. Sissons, Constance M. Sissons, and Lee County Tax Collector. The petitioner is seeking to acquire certain property in Lee County, F...
Mediator Report
Date: October 06, 2008Motion
Date: November 12, 2008Stipulation
Date: August 28, 2008Motion
Date: August 28, 2008Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 25, 2008Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 25, 2008Answer
Date: August 07, 2008Petition
Date: July 11, 2008Request for AdmissionsAmended
Date: July 23, 2008Notice of Mediation9-30-08 @ 9am
Date: July 24, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulated Judgment | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Order of TakingAmendment | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulated Judgment | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulated Judgment | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Mediator Report | |
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Amended Notice | |
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Checks Forwarded to Tax Collector's Office | |
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Check Mailed from Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.