Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wynn, Shaun, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Roberts, Rorie, Swatman, Kathryn, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: May 08, 2023VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: June 12, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: February 20, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 25, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: February 20, 2023MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT
Date: March 02, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: January 03, 2023NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE
Date: February 20, 2023TEXT
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: February 13, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF
Date: February 15, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 25, 2022MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT
Date: January 25, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 05, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: December 30, 2022MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2022ORDER
Date: December 06, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 06, 2022MOTION
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 25, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 25, 2022ORDER
Date: June 16, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 05, 2022TEXT
Date: November 16, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 28, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 05, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 16, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO SWATMAN, KATHRYN
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF
Date: January 13, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY ROBERTS, RORIE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 05, 2022DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 05, 2022RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE
Date: January 05, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO ROBERTS, RORIE / 10/20/2021
Date: October 22, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 14, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 14, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY SWATMAN, KATHRYN
Date: December 29, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 30, 2021PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2695438, FULLY PAID
Date: November 29, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 14, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO SWATMAN, KATHRYN
Date: September 30, 2021DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 10, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 16, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO SWATMAN, KATHRYN
Date: October 22, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: September 30, 2021PAID $420.00 ON RECEIPT 2681289, FULLY PAID
Date: September 30, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERTS, RORIE
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFT RORIE ROBERTS WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CLAIM |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST & EXHIBIT |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION 03/03/2023 AT 10:00 AM |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION MARCH 1, 2023 |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SECOND MEDIATION CONFERENCE |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.