Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Madison Alamosa Hecm Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Broadway, Lynn, Broadway Unknown Spouse, Lynn, Cook Deceased Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantees Assignees Lienors Creditors Trustees Or Other Claimants Claiming By Through Under Or Against, Loretta F, Cook Jr, John A, Cook, Shannon, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with SINGELTARY, G RICHARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO COOK UNKNOWN SPOUSE, JOHN A JR / 02/03/2021
Date: February 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO COOK, JOHN A JR
Date: January 19, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 05, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1,
Date: February 15, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: February 22, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: January 15, 2021FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET WITH ATTACHED BIDDING DOCUMENTATION
Date: October 12, 2021TEXT
Date: January 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2021COVER LETTER DATED
Date: April 22, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO BROADWAY, LYNN / 02/04/2021
Date: February 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1,
Date: January 19, 2021COVER LETTER DATED
Date: June 07, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 27, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO BROADWAY, LYNN
Date: January 19, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2,
Date: February 15, 2021PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2684262, FULLY PAID
Date: October 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO DELONG, TAMMY
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED AND
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: June 03, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO COOK UNKNOWN SPOUSE, SHANNON
Date: January 19, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: June 09, 2021PAID $1,044.00 ON RECEIPT 2611346, FULLY PAID
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO COOK, JOHN A JR / 02/03/2021
Date: February 15, 2021PAID $105,682.30 ON RECEIPT 2684226, FULLY PAID
Date: October 12, 2021MOTION
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT,
Date: January 19, 2021PROPOSED DOCUMENT
Date: November 18, 2021COVER LETTER DATED
Date: September 02, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO DELONG UNKNOWN SPOUSE, TAMMY
Date: February 15, 2021CLERK'S LETTER
Date: April 19, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVICE AS TO COOK UNKNOWN SPOUSE, SHANNON
Date: February 15, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO DELONG, TAMMY / 02/08/2021
Date: February 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 02, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED AND
Date: July 14, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO COOK, SHANNON
Date: January 19, 2021VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM
Date: January 15, 2021DISCLAIMER BY SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT,
Date: March 02, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO DELONG UNKNOWN SPOUSE, TAMMY
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 07, 2021PROPOSED DOCUMENT
Date: February 24, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO COOK, SHANNON / 02/04/2021
Date: February 15, 2021NOTICE
Date: July 13, 2021LIS PENDENS
Date: January 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO
Date: October 25, 2021ORDER RESETTING/RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 04, 2021PAID $6.00 ON RECEIPT 2643241, FULLY PAID
Date: May 06, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED AS TO SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, / 02/03/2021
Date: February 15, 2021MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 13, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2,
Date: January 19, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 22, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO COOK UNKNOWN SPOUSE, JOHN A JR
Date: January 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO
Date: October 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED TO DELONG UNKNOWN SPOUSE, TAMMY
Date: January 12, 2021REFUND REQUEST ISSUED
Date: November 19, 2021FORECLOSURE SALE CANCELLED
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
REFUND REQUEST ISSUED 2693817 $103,400.00 MADISON ALAMOSA HECM LLC C/O MCINTYRE THANASIDES |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED DOCUMENT | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO EXPERT INVESTMENTS LLC // FILED AND RECORDED // WITH $723.80 DOC STAMPS |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET WITH ATTACHED BIDDING DOCUMENTATION | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2684262, FULLY PAID $70.00 2684262 Fully Paid |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $105,682.30 ON RECEIPT 2684226, FULLY PAID $105,682.30 2684226 Fully Paid |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO EXPERT INVESTMENTS LLC // FOR BID OF $103,400.00 // TITLE TO ISSUE OCTOBER 25, 2021 |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE PUBLISHED IN THE DAILY COMMERCIAL ON SEPTEMBER 14 & 21, 2021 // SALE RESET FOR OCTOBER 12, 2021 AT 11:00 AM |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE ISSUED AND IMAGED FOR ATTORNEY TO PUBLISH // SALE RESET FOR OCTOBER 12, 2021 AT 11:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.