Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services L, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Vamvas, Anthony Demetrius, against Glover, Aimee N, Glover, William B, Unknown Spouse Of Aimee Nicole, Unknown Spouse Of William Brax, Unknown Tenant 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GARCIA, ANA MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
This complaint is a verified mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC against defendants William Braxton Glover, Unknown Spouse of William Braxton Glover, Aimee Nicole Glover, Unknown Spouse of Aimee Nicole Glover, Un...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 28, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: September 28, 2023LIS PENDENS
Date: September 28, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: September 28, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED: 09/29/23
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: September 29, 2023CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-00-06
Date: September 28, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 04, 2023RECEIPT
Date: September 29, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: October 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $974.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $974.00 Receipt Number MX 2023010193 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: GARCIA , ANA M HONORABLE Assigned | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 322023CA000229CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/28/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.